EP3241306 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIU, Kermit 5-6F No. 44-46 Jianzhong Road Guangzhou Guangdong 510630 / CN | 02 /
CHEN, Cedar 5-6F No. 44-46 Jianzhong Road Guangzhou Guangdong 510630 / CN | 03 /
HERBER, Thorsten Torshamnsgatan 21 S-16480 Stockholm / SE | 04 /
SVEDBERG, Johan Torshamnsgatan 21 S-16480 Stockholm / SE | [2017/45] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2017/45] | Application number, filing date | 14909299.1 | 29.12.2014 | [2017/45] | WO2014CN95280 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016106486 | Date: | 07.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3241306 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24, H04W84/02 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
H04L41/0893 (EP,US);
H04L41/044 (US);
H04L41/04 (US);
H04L45/745 (EP,US);
H04W84/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/45] | H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KONFIGURIERUNG EINES KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMS | [2017/45] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING A COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2017/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE CONFIGURATION D'UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION | [2017/45] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2017 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2017 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/45] | 13.06.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 28.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003074436 (GIESEKE ERIC J [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2004249904 (MOORE DANIEL [AU], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [XI]WO2008110202 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,10,12 * abstract * * page 24, lines 1-26 * * page 25, lines 13-21 * [I] 2-9,11,13-15 | International search | [X]CN101512507 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-24 * description page 3, paragraph 2 -page 23, paragraph 1 *; | [A]CN102970376 (BEIJING SUGON INF IND BEIJING) [A] 1-24* The whole document *; | [A]CN103731825 (BEIJING INST TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-24 * The whole document * |