Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015288008 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514742113 | 17.06.2015 | JP2008302465 | 27.11.2008 | WO2009JP69425 | 16.11.2009 | US201113129986 | 02.08.2011 | JP2008298191 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9786931 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2017 | B2 | US2011274998 | 10.11.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008302465 | 27.11.2008 | WO2009JP69425 | 16.11.2009 | JP2008298191 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5428307B | Global Dossier | 26.02.2014 | B2 | JP2010129354 | 10.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008302465 | 27.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5228835B | Global Dossier | 03.07.2013 | B2 | JP2010123501 | 03.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008298191 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2357699 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2016 | B1 | EP2357699 | 07.05.2014 | A4 | EP2357699 | 17.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008302465 | 27.11.2008 | WO2009JP69425 | 16.11.2009 | JP2008298191 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2887436 | Global Dossier | 14.09.2016 | B1 | EP2887436 | 24.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008302465 | 27.11.2008 | EP09827528 | 16.11.2009 | JP2008298191 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0921969 | 10.12.2019 | B1 | BRPI0921969 | 11.09.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2008302465 | 27.11.2008 | WO2009JP69425 | 16.11.2009 | JP2008298191 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2744304 | 10.12.2013 | C | CA2744304 | 27.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008302465 | 27.11.2008 | WO2009JP69425 | 16.11.2009 | JP2008298191 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102224627B | 19.08.2015 | B | CN102224627 | 19.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008302465 | 27.11.2008 | WO2009JP69425 | 16.11.2009 | JP2008298191 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103401007B | 20.01.2016 | B | CN103401007 | 20.11.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008302465 | 27.11.2008 | JP2008298191 | 21.11.2008 | CN200980146527 | 16.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2472256 | 10.01.2013 | C1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008302465 | 27.11.2008 | WO2009JP69425 | 16.11.2009 | JP2008298191 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010058747 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008302465 | 27.11.2008 | JP2008298191 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2521471 | 27.06.2014 | C1 | RU2012139070 | 10.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008302465 | 27.11.2008 | JP2008298191 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2507644 | 20.02.2014 | C1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008302465 | 27.11.2008 | JP2008298191 | 21.11.2008 | Type | Earlier application | EP2357699 |