EP2899437 - Sanitary mixing valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hansa Armaturen GmbH Sigmaringer Strasse 107 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schrader, Jens Trossinger Str. 28 70619 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
Hackspacher, Franz Im Vogelsang 18 72622 Nürtingen / DE | 03 /
Walter, Andreas Esslinger Str. 50 72669 Unterensingen / DE | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Azenbergstraße 35 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/31] | Wahl, Markus, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestraße 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 15000084.2 | 15.01.2015 | [2015/31] | Priority number, date | DE20141000840 | 22.01.2014 Original published format: DE102014000840 | [2015/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2899437 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2899437 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16K47/04, F16K11/078 | [2015/31] | CPC: |
F16K47/04 (EP,CN);
F16K11/0787 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2015/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Sanitäres Mischventil | [2015/31] | English: | Sanitary mixing valve | [2015/31] | French: | Vanne mélangeuse sanitaire | [2015/31] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 29.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.01.2015 | AL | 04.01.2017 | CY | 04.01.2017 | CZ | 04.01.2017 | DK | 04.01.2017 | EE | 04.01.2017 | HR | 04.01.2017 | LT | 04.01.2017 | LV | 04.01.2017 | MC | 04.01.2017 | MK | 04.01.2017 | MT | 04.01.2017 | NL | 04.01.2017 | PL | 04.01.2017 | RO | 04.01.2017 | RS | 04.01.2017 | SI | 04.01.2017 | SK | 04.01.2017 | SM | 04.01.2017 | IE | 15.01.2017 | LU | 15.01.2017 | BE | 31.01.2017 | BG | 04.04.2017 | NO | 04.04.2017 | GR | 05.04.2017 | IS | 04.05.2017 | PT | 04.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 15.01.2015 | |
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MK | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2017 | ||
LU | 15.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 15.01.2015 | |
CY | 04.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2017 | ||
LU | 15.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 15.01.2015 | |
CZ | 04.01.2017 | ||
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2017 | ||
LU | 15.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2017 | ||
LU | 15.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SI | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
IE | 15.01.2017 | ||
LU | 15.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
SM | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 15.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
DK | 04.01.2017 | ||
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
MC | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
EE | 04.01.2017 | ||
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RO | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
SK | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 04.01.2017 | |
HR | 04.01.2017 | ||
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HR | 04.01.2017 | |
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
LV | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
RS | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
BG | 04.04.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | ||
PT | 04.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | HR | 04.01.2017 | |
LT | 04.01.2017 | ||
NL | 04.01.2017 | ||
PL | 04.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 04.04.2017 | ||
GR | 05.04.2017 | ||
IS | 04.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2937475 (HANSA METALLWERKE AG) [AD] 1-4 * figures 1-10 *; | [A]WO8901585 (ORAS OY [FI]) [A] 1-4 * figures 7,8 * * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 3 * | by applicant | DE2937475 |