EP3045540 - Enzymatic process for the regioselective manufacturing of N-Fmoc-doxorubicin-14-O-dicarboxylic acid mono esters [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Æterna Zentaris GmbH Weismüllerstraße 50 60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuster, Tilmann Valentin-Hock-Strasse 32 D-63762 Großostheim / DE | 02 /
Gerlach, Matthias Pfarrgasse 1 D-63636 Brachttal / DE | 03 /
Schuch, Falk Schönecker Strasse 15 D-61194 Niddatal / DE | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Godemeyer Blum Lenze Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB - werkpatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 15000132.9 | 19.01.2015 | [2016/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3045540 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/56, C07H15/252 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
C07H15/252 (EP,US);
C12P19/56 (EP,CN,US);
C12P17/06 (US);
C07H1/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] |
Former [2016/29] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 24.01.2017 | ME | 24.01.2017 | Title | German: | Enzymatisches Verfahren zur regioselektiven Herstellung von N-Fmoc-doxorubicin-14-o-dicarboxylsäurenmonoestern | [2016/29] | English: | Enzymatic process for the regioselective manufacturing of N-Fmoc-doxorubicin-14-O-dicarboxylic acid mono esters | [2016/29] | French: | Procédé enzymatique pour la fabrication régiosélective d'esters monoacides de N-Fmoc-doxorubicine-14-O-dicarboxyliques | [2016/29] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 23.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 29.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.03.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 23.03.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDAI]WO03057896 (ALBANY MOLECULAR RES INC [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,4,5 * examples 1-6, 11, 12; claims 1, 4, 7, 8, 51 * [A] 8-17 [I] 3,6,7; | [AD] - IAN C. COTTERILL ET AL, "Reversible derivatization to enhance enzymatic synthesis: Chemoenzymatic synthesis of doxorubicin-14- O -esters", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20081015), vol. 101, no. 3, doi:10.1002/bit.21929, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 435 - 440, XP055197141 [AD] 1-17 * abstract * * page 438, column l, paragraph 4 - page 439, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.21929 | by applicant | US5843903 | WO03057896 | - NAGY ET AL., J. PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, page 7269 | - COTTERILL ET AL., ORGANIC PROCESS RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT, (2005), vol. 9, page 818 | - COTTERILL ET AL., BIOTECH AND BIOENG., (2008), vol. 101, page 435 | - COTTERILL ET AL., BIOTECH AND BIOENG., (2008), page 43 | - BERGLUND, "Controlling Lipase Enantioselectivity for Organic Synthesis", BIOMOL. ENG., (2001), vol. 18, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/S1389-0344(01)00081-8, pages 13 - 22, XP004248759 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-0344(01)00081-8 | - BROCCA ET AL., "Novel Lipases Having Altered Substrate Specificity, Methods for Their Preparation, and Their Use in Biocatalytic Applications", EUR. PAT. APPL., (2001), page 33 | - SVENDSEN, "Lipase Protein Engineering", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2000), vol. 1543, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/S0167-4838(00)00239-9, pages 223 - 238, XP004279107 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-4838(00)00239-9 | - WONG ET AL., "Lipase Engineering: A Window into Structure-Function Relationships", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1997), vol. 284, pages 171 - 84 | - COTTERILL ET AL., ORGANIC PROCESS RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT, (2005), vol. 9, page 818 |