EP3048597 - Simulation assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEC GmbH Marktstr. 191 72793 Pfullingen / DE | [2018/12] |
Former [2016/30] | For all designated states Buck Engineering & Consulting GmbH Gartenstr. 11 72764 Reutlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buck, Matthias Gartenstrasse 11 72764 Reutlingen / DE | 02 /
Farah, Oussama Ben Rüderner Strasse 10 70329 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
Gerlich, Martin Urbanstrasse 48 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/30] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Annette, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstraße 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/30] | Application number, filing date | 15000165.9 | 21.01.2015 | [2016/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3048597 | Date: | 27.07.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3048597 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G09B9/12, B25J19/00 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
B25J11/00 (EP,US);
B25J19/0041 (EP,US);
G09B9/02 (EP,US);
G09B9/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] |
Former [2016/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Simulationsanordnung | [2016/30] | English: | Simulation assembly | [2016/30] | French: | Agencement de simulation | [2016/30] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 06.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.01.2015 | AL | 15.08.2018 | CY | 15.08.2018 | CZ | 15.08.2018 | DK | 15.08.2018 | EE | 15.08.2018 | ES | 15.08.2018 | FI | 15.08.2018 | HR | 15.08.2018 | IT | 15.08.2018 | LT | 15.08.2018 | LV | 15.08.2018 | MC | 15.08.2018 | MK | 15.08.2018 | MT | 15.08.2018 | NL | 15.08.2018 | PL | 15.08.2018 | RO | 15.08.2018 | RS | 15.08.2018 | SE | 15.08.2018 | SI | 15.08.2018 | SK | 15.08.2018 | SM | 15.08.2018 | TR | 15.08.2018 | BG | 15.11.2018 | NO | 15.11.2018 | GR | 16.11.2018 | IS | 15.12.2018 | PT | 15.12.2018 | GB | 21.01.2019 | IE | 21.01.2019 | LU | 21.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | FR | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 21.01.2015 | |
AL | 15.08.2018 | ||
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
GB | 21.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.01.2019 | ||
LU | 21.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CY | 15.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
GB | 21.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.01.2019 | ||
LU | 21.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
MT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
PT | 15.12.2018 | ||
GB | 21.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.01.2019 | ||
LU | 21.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
TR | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
GB | 21.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.01.2019 | ||
LU | 21.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
GB | 21.01.2019 | ||
IE | 21.01.2019 | ||
LU | 21.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
GB | 21.01.2019 | ||
LU | 21.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
GB | 21.01.2019 | ||
LU | 21.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 21.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 21.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 21.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
MC | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SI | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
DK | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
SM | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
EE | 15.08.2018 | ||
ES | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
SK | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
CZ | 15.08.2018 | ||
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
PL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RO | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
IT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 15.08.2018 | |
FI | 15.08.2018 | ||
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
LV | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
HR | 15.08.2018 | ||
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
RS | 15.08.2018 | ||
SE | 15.08.2018 | ||
BG | 15.11.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
GR | 16.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NL | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 15.08.2018 | |
LT | 15.08.2018 | ||
NO | 15.11.2018 | ||
IS | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 15.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2003085681 (SAKAMOTO MASAFUMI [JP], et al) [Y] 2-5 * paragraphs [0024] - [0026]; figure 2 * [A] 1,6-15; | [A]WO2010105638 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 9, lines 18-21; figures 1,3 *; | [XY]WO2011144228 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE], et al) [X] 1,6-15 * the whole document * [Y] 2-5; | [I] - Max Planck Institute, "Cybermotion Simulator", (20150120), URL: http://www.kyb.tuebingen.mpg.de/research/equipment/vrf/vr/motionlab-old/motion-simulators-old.html, (20150625), XP055198492 [I] 1,6-15 * the whole document * | [A] - Kuka Roboter Gmbh, "Robots KR 360-3; KR 500-3 Spezifikation Version: Spez KR 360-3 KR 500-3 V5 de (PDF)", (20130716), pages 1,9 - 18, URL: http://www.kuka-robotics.com/res/sps/e6c77545-9030-49b1-93f5-4d17c92173aa_Spez_KR_360-3_KR_500-3_de.pdf, (20150625), XP002741409 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2363849 |