01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
12.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.07.2020 [2020/29] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
13.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
27.09.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
21.06.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
11.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] |
13.07.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
09.07.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.07.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.07.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
22.03.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
16.02.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
12.02.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.12.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.12.2017 |
First examination report |
|
03.02.2017 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.02.2017 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
03.02.2017 |
Change - designated states |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
01.02.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
27.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
27.01.2015 |
Change - representative |
|