Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6043388B | Global Dossier | 14.12.2016 | B2 | JP2015182888 | 22.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102014004089 | 21.03.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2921431 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2016 | B1 | EP2921431 | 23.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014004089 | 21.03.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102014004089 | 22.10.2015 | B4 | DE102014004089 | 24.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102014004089 | 21.03.2014 |