EP2921661 - LASH ADJUSTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otics Corporation 10 Hamadashimo, Nakabata-cho Nishio-shi Aichi 444-0392 / JP | [2016/10] |
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states Otics Corporation 10 Hamadashimo, Nakabata-cho 444-0392 Aichi Nishio-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Hiroki c/o Otics Corporation 10 Hamadashimo, Nakabata-cho Nishio-shi, Aichi, 444-0392 / JP | 02 /
Haga, Yoshiaki c/o Otics Corporation 10 Hamadashimo, Nakabata-cho Nishio-shi, Aichi, 444-0392 / JP | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2015/39] | Application number, filing date | 15000761.5 | 22.01.2014 | [2015/39] | Priority number, date | JP20130027982 | 15.02.2013 Original published format: JP 2013027982 | [2015/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2921661 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2921661 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/24, F01L1/18 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
F01L1/182 (EP,US);
F01L1/24 (EP,US);
F01L1/2405 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] |
Former [2015/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPIELAUSGLEICHSELEMENT | [2015/39] | English: | LASH ADJUSTER | [2015/39] | French: | RÉGULATEUR HYDRAULIQUE DE JEU | [2015/39] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2015 | Examination requested [2015/52] | 09.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 10.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP14000227.0 / EP2767685 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.01.2014 | AL | 27.04.2016 | AT | 27.04.2016 | BE | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | DK | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | ES | 27.04.2016 | FI | 27.04.2016 | HR | 27.04.2016 | IT | 27.04.2016 | LT | 27.04.2016 | LV | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | MK | 27.04.2016 | NL | 27.04.2016 | PL | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | RS | 27.04.2016 | SE | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SK | 27.04.2016 | SM | 27.04.2016 | TR | 27.04.2016 | NO | 27.07.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | IS | 27.08.2016 | PT | 29.08.2016 | IE | 22.01.2017 | LU | 22.01.2017 | MT | 22.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 22.01.2014 | |
AL | 27.04.2016 | ||
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.01.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2017 | ||
MT | 22.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 22.01.2014 | |
AL | 27.04.2016 | ||
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.01.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2017 | ||
MT | 22.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 22.01.2014 | |
AL | 27.04.2016 | ||
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.01.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2017 | ||
MT | 22.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 22.01.2014 | |
AL | 27.04.2016 | ||
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.01.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2017 | ||
MT | 22.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.01.2014 | |
AL | 27.04.2016 | ||
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.01.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2017 | ||
MT | 22.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 27.04.2016 | |
AT | 27.04.2016 | ||
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.01.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2017 | ||
MT | 22.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.01.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2017 | ||
MT | 22.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
IE | 22.01.2017 | ||
LU | 22.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/02] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 22.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
BE | 27.04.2016 | ||
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 27.04.2016 | |
ES | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 27.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102006004751 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE102006017442 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]JPS57181908 (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPS61118509 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE102006007375 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5706773 (DURA LOWELL EUGENE [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,3 *; | [A]DE19614668 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]WO9215776 (SCHAEFFLER WAELZLAGER KG [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2012042843 (KUBOTA YUKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [AD]JP2004197665 (OTICS CORP) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2004197665 |