EP3081106 - SOLE INSERT FOR CROSS-COUNTRY SKI BOOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/42] | SOLE INSERT AND TIGHTENING STRAP FOR CROSS-COUNTRY SKI SHOES | ||
[2017/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Morgenstern, Gottfried Birkenweg 5 94255 Böbrach / DE | [2016/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/42] | Application number, filing date | 15001042.9 | 13.04.2015 | [2016/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3081106 | Date: | 19.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3081106 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A43B5/04 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
A43B5/0413 (EP);
A43B1/0081 (EP);
A43B5/0411 (EP);
A43B5/0421 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/42] | A43B3/16, A43B5/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] |
Former [2016/42] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SOHLENEINSATZ FÜR LANGLAUF-SKISCHUHE | [2017/16] | English: | SOLE INSERT FOR CROSS-COUNTRY SKI BOOTS | [2017/16] | French: | INSERT DE SEMELLE POUR CHAUSSURES DE SKI DE FOND | [2017/16] |
Former [2016/42] | SOHLENEINSATZ UND SPANNBAND FÜR LANGLAUF-SKISCHUHE | ||
Former [2016/42] | SOLE INSERT AND TIGHTENING STRAP FOR CROSS-COUNTRY SKI SHOES | ||
Former [2016/42] | INSERT DE SEMELLE ET BANDE DE TENSION POUR CHAUSSURE DE SKI DE FOND | Examination procedure | 13.04.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/42] | 24.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2016/42] | 20.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 13.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 01.07.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 01.07.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.07.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 01.07.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 01.07.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.07.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.04.2015 | AL | 28.06.2017 | CY | 28.06.2017 | CZ | 28.06.2017 | DK | 28.06.2017 | EE | 28.06.2017 | ES | 28.06.2017 | FI | 28.06.2017 | HR | 28.06.2017 | IT | 28.06.2017 | LT | 28.06.2017 | LV | 28.06.2017 | MC | 28.06.2017 | MK | 28.06.2017 | MT | 28.06.2017 | NL | 28.06.2017 | PL | 28.06.2017 | PT | 28.06.2017 | RO | 28.06.2017 | RS | 28.06.2017 | SE | 28.06.2017 | SI | 28.06.2017 | SK | 28.06.2017 | SM | 28.06.2017 | TR | 28.06.2017 | BG | 28.09.2017 | NO | 28.09.2017 | GR | 29.09.2017 | IS | 28.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.04.2015 | |
CY | 28.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MK | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 13.04.2015 | |
CZ | 28.06.2017 | ||
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RO | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PT | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
TR | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MC | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
MT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SI | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
DK | 28.06.2017 | ||
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
ES | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
IT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
PL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
SM | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
IS | 28.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 28.06.2017 | |
EE | 28.06.2017 | ||
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
SK | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 28.06.2017 | |
FI | 28.06.2017 | ||
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
NL | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
LV | 28.06.2017 | ||
RS | 28.06.2017 | ||
SE | 28.06.2017 | ||
BG | 28.09.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 28.06.2017 | |
HR | 28.06.2017 | ||
LT | 28.06.2017 | ||
NO | 28.09.2017 | ||
GR | 29.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012011746 (VALAAS LAURA AUBREY [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0030] - [0033]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2009307931 (MAY FREDERICK ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0093] *; | [A]US5727339 (OWEN DAVID B [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3304538 | DE3334144 | DE3626476 | DE3816668 | DE9200453U |