EP2937892 - JET GENERATING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CREATING A FLUID JET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microliquids GmbH Hans-Adolf-Krebs-Weg 1 37077 Göttingen / DE | [2015/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faubel, Manfred c/o Microliquids GmbH, Hans-Adolf-Krebs-Weg 1 37077 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
Figul, Stephan c/o Microliquids GmbH, Hans-Adolf-Krebs-Weg 1 37077 Göttingen / DE | [2015/44] | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/44] | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15001082.5 | 15.04.2015 | [2015/44] | Priority number, date | DE20141006063 | 25.04.2014 Original published format: DE102014006063 | [2015/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2937892 | Date: | 28.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/04, H05G2/00 | [2015/44] | CPC: |
H05G2/006 (EP,US);
B05B9/002 (US);
B05B14/00 (EP,US);
B05B9/0403 (US);
B05B9/042 (US);
H01J2235/082 (EP,US);
H01J49/0445 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] |
Former [2015/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRAHLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES FLÜSSIGKEITSSTRAHLS | [2015/44] | English: | JET GENERATING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CREATING A FLUID JET | [2015/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GÉNÉRATION DE JET ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN JET DE LIQUIDE | [2015/44] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 27.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002015473 (HERTZ HANS MARTIN [SE], et al) [X] 1,4,8 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0015] , [0022] , [0025] - [0028] - [0038] * [I] 2,3; | [X]US2007228298 (KOMORI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,7,8 * figures 1,4b,5,8 * * paragraphs [0040] , [0042] - [0045] - [0048] , [0071] *; | [A]WO2010083854 (EXCILLUM AB [SE], et al) [A] 5,9 * figure 4 * * page 1, lines 2-4,12-20 ** page 13, lines 3-23 *; | [XI]WO2010112048 (EXCILLUM AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8,9 * figures 1-3,5,6 * * page 1, lines 2,3,26-29 * * page 2, lines 2-6,14-22 * * page 3, line 1 - page 5, line 24 * * page 6, line 4 - page 7, line 15 * * page 8, line 18 - page 13, line 31 * * page 15, lines 4-23 * [I] 2,3,6,10; | [A]US2012145930 (KUWABARA HAJIME [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 3,4 * * paragraphs [0031] - [0046] - [0052] , [0055] * | by applicant | WO2004110112 | US2007158540 | US2011116604 | - A. CHARVAT ET AL., REV. SCI. INSTRUM., (2004), vol. 75, pages 1209 - 1218 | - B. WINTER ET AL., CHEM. REV., (2006), vol. 106, pages 1176 - 1211 | - B. A. M. HANSSON ET AL., J. PHYS. D: APPL. PHYS., (2004), vol. 37, pages 3233 - 3243 | - L. RYMELL ET AL., OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, (1993), vol. 103, pages 105 - 110 | - M. FAUBEL ET AL., ROYAL SOC. CHEM., (1987), pages 133 - 136 |