EP2995797 - CHARGE AIR COOLER ASSEMBLY WITH CONDENSATE SUCTION AND PIVOTABLE CHARGE AIR COOLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Strasse 667 80995 München / DE | ||
Former [2019/23] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus AG Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/11] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus AG Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neff, Andreas Reginbaldstr. 15 81247 München / DE | 02 /
Böhm, Martin Finkenstr. 26 90559 Burgthann / DE | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | Kotitschke, Bernd V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/23] | Kotitschke, Bernd v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15001209.4 | 23.04.2015 | [2016/11] | Priority number, date | DE20141013502 | 11.09.2014 Original published format: DE102014013502 | [2016/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2995797 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2995797 | Date: | 05.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02B29/04, F02M31/20, F28F9/02, // F28F17/00, F02M25/028 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
F02B29/0468 (EP,RU);
F02M31/20 (EP,RU);
F28F9/0246 (EP,RU);
F02M25/028 (EP);
F28F17/005 (EP);
F28F2255/02 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/11] | F02B29/04, F02M31/20, // F28F17/00, F02M25/028 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Title | German: | LADELUFTKÜHLERANORDNUNG MIT KONDENSATABSAUGUNG UND VERSCHWENKBAREM LADELUFTKÜHLER | [2016/11] | English: | CHARGE AIR COOLER ASSEMBLY WITH CONDENSATE SUCTION AND PIVOTABLE CHARGE AIR COOLER | [2016/11] | French: | SYSTÈME REFROIDISSEUR D'AIR DE SURALIMENTATION DOTÉ D'UN SYSTÈME D'ASPIRATION DE CONDENSAT ET REFROIDISSEUR D'AIR DE SURALIMENTATION PIVOTABLE | [2016/11] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 27.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2015 | AL | 05.06.2019 | CY | 05.06.2019 | CZ | 05.06.2019 | DK | 05.06.2019 | EE | 05.06.2019 | ES | 05.06.2019 | FI | 05.06.2019 | HR | 05.06.2019 | LT | 05.06.2019 | LV | 05.06.2019 | MC | 05.06.2019 | MK | 05.06.2019 | MT | 05.06.2019 | PL | 05.06.2019 | RO | 05.06.2019 | RS | 05.06.2019 | SI | 05.06.2019 | SK | 05.06.2019 | SM | 05.06.2019 | TR | 05.06.2019 | BG | 05.09.2019 | NO | 05.09.2019 | GR | 06.09.2019 | IS | 05.10.2019 | PT | 07.10.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 23.04.2015 | |
AL | 05.06.2019 | ||
CY | 05.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
MT | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
MC | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
PL | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SI | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
DK | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
TR | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
SM | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
IS | 05.10.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
EE | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
SK | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RO | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
PT | 07.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
CZ | 05.06.2019 | ||
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
BG | 05.09.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 05.06.2019 | |
ES | 05.06.2019 | ||
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
HR | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
LV | 05.06.2019 | ||
RS | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | ||
GR | 06.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 05.06.2019 | |
FI | 05.06.2019 | ||
LT | 05.06.2019 | ||
NO | 05.09.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3545336 (MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE GMBH [DE]); | [A]FR2922962 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR]); | [A]DE102007061049 (MAN DIESEL AS [DK]); | [XAI]WO2009130083 (VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES [FR], et al); | [A]US2011107760 (QUINN RICHARD D [US], et al); | [XI]DE102011056617 (PORSCHE AG [DE]); | [A]US2013306040 (YAMADA SHUYA SHARK [US]) |