EP3088708 - THROTTLE VALVE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar Motoren GmbH & Co. KG Falckensteiner Strasse 2 24159 Kiel / DE | [2016/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sixel, Eike Joachim Russeer Weg 187 24109 Kiel / DE | [2016/44] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2016/44] | Application number, filing date | 15001263.1 | 29.04.2015 | [2016/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3088708 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02D9/10, F16K1/22 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
F02D9/101 (EP);
F02D9/1015 (EP);
F02D9/1025 (EP);
F02D9/1055 (EP);
F02D9/109 (EP);
F16K1/222 (EP);
F16K1/223 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DROSSELKLAPPE FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2016/44] | English: | THROTTLE VALVE FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2016/44] | French: | PAPILLON DES GAZ POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2016/44] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/47] | 27.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US4356801 (GRAHAM KENNETH A) [X] 7-10,12-14 * abstract * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 34 * [A] 1-6 [I] 11,15; | [XI]JPS63170537U (-) [X] 1-5,7-10,12-14 * figure - * [I] 6,11,15; | [XAI]US6076499 (KLUMPP PETER [DE]) [X] 12-14 * abstract * * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 6 * [A] 1-11 [I] 15; | [XAI]US5640941 (HAZEN DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 7-10 * abstract * [A] 1-6,12-15 [I] 11; | [XAI]DE4003274 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [X] 12-14 * abstract * [A] 1-11 [I] 15; | [XAI]US2002148437 (KATOU YUUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 7-10,12-14 * abstract * [A] 1-6 [I] 11,15; | [XA]DE3620338 (OS BAD ROZWOJOWY SAMOCH [PL]) [X] 12-14 * abstract * * column 7, line 42 - column 8, line 17 * [A] 1-7,15; | [A]JPS6140435 (KODO KEIUN) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |