EP2952311 - DEVICE FOR MIXING CONCRETE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ammann Elba Beton GmbH Bahnhofstrasse 12-21 76275 Ettingen / DE | [2015/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerst, Thomas Sonnenstrasse 11 D-76137 Karlsruhe / DE | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Azenbergstraße 35 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | Heinrich, Hanjo, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestraße 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 15001592.3 | 27.05.2015 | [2015/50] | Priority number, date | DE20141008067 | 27.05.2014 Original published format: DE102014008067 | [2015/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2952311 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B28C5/16, B01F7/30 | [2015/50] | CPC: |
B28C5/168 (EP);
B01F27/95 (EP);
B01F35/33 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/28] |
Former [2015/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM MISCHEN VON BETON | [2015/50] | English: | DEVICE FOR MIXING CONCRETE | [2015/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DESTINÉ À MÉLANGER LE BÉTON | [2015/50] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 03.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/20] | 08.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CN2738875Y (GUIBAO SCIENCE TECHNOLOGY CO L [CN]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * abstract * [Y] 5,6; | [X]DE102008060588 (PEMAT MISCHTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,7-10 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0023]; figure - *; | [Y]DE102008033644 (ELBA WERK MASCHINEN GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0030]; figure 3 * |