Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8926295 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2015 | B2 | US2012156067 | 21.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9737208 | 13.06.2008 | JP2005362837 | 16.12.2005 | WO2006JP324669 | 11.12.2006 | US201213400882 | 21.02.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8147220 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2012 | B2 | US2009232679 | 17.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005362837 | 16.12.2005 | WO2006JP324669 | 11.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1961959 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2016 | B1 | EP1961959 | 09.10.2013 | A4 | EP1961959 | 27.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005362837 | 16.12.2005 | WO2006JP324669 | 11.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006324579B | Global Dossier | 27.05.2010 | B2 | AU2006324579 | 21.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005362837 | 16.12.2005 | WO2006JP324669 | 11.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2949935 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2020 | B1 | EP2949935 | 02.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005362837 | 16.12.2005 | EP06834424 | 11.12.2006 | WO2006JP324669 | 11.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101326368B | 08.09.2010 | B | CN101326368 | 17.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005362837 | 16.12.2005 | WO2006JP324669 | 11.12.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2567593T | 25.04.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2005362837 | 16.12.2005 | WO2006JP324669 | 11.12.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007069564 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005362837 | 16.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100938053B | Global Dossier | 21.01.2010 | B1 | KR20080065001 | 10.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005362837 | 16.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3960347B | Global Dossier | 15.08.2007 | B2 | JP2007162641 | 28.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005362837 | 16.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101858348B | 21.12.2011 | B | CN101858348 | 13.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005362837 | 16.12.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2823801T | 10.05.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2005362837 | 16.12.2005 | Type | Earlier application | EP1961959 |