EP3018318 - CHARGE AIR COOLER, AND INTAKE MANIFOLD INCLUDING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Modine Manufacturing Company 1500 DeKoven Avenue Racine Wisconsin 53403 / US | For all designated states MANN+HUMMEL GmbH Schwieberdinger Str. 126 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2021/20] |
Former [2016/19] | For all designated states Modine Manufacturing Company 1500 DeKoven Avenue Racine Wisconsin 53403 / US | ||
For all designated states MANN + HUMMEL GMBH Hindenburgstr. 45 71638 Ludwigsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meshenky, Steven P. 6513 Spring Meadow Lane Racine, WI 53406 / US | 02 /
Braun, Jason J. 2965 Forestview Circle Franksville, WI 53126 / US | 03 /
Moore, Christopher Michael 4832 Tanglewood Avenue Racine, WI 53402 / US | 04 /
Speidel, Gerrit-Tobias In der Gerste 4 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | 05 /
Bühl, Heinz Rosenstrasse 46 74235 Erlenbach / DE | 06 /
Korn, Alexander Beethovenstr. 32 74363 Güglingen / DE | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/19] | Wolter, Klaus-Dietrich Modine Europe GmbH Patentabteilung 70790 Filderstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 15002424.8 | 14.08.2015 | [2016/19] | Priority number, date | US201414461955 | 18.08.2014 Original published format: US201414461955 | [2016/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3018318 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3018318 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02B29/04, F28D9/00, // F28D21/00 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
F02B29/0462 (EP);
F28D9/0031 (EP);
F28D2021/0082 (EP);
F28F2275/205 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/19] | F02B29/04, F28F9/00, F28F9/007, F28D9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] |
Former [2016/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LADELUFTKÜHLER UND ANSAUGMODUL DAMIT | [2023/52] | English: | CHARGE AIR COOLER, AND INTAKE MANIFOLD INCLUDING THE SAME | [2016/19] | French: | REFROIDISSEUR D'AIR DE SURALIMENTATION ET COLLECTEUR D'ADMISSION COMPRENANT CELUI-CI | [2023/51] |
Former [2016/19] | LADELUFTKÜHLER UND EINLASSVERTEILER DAMIT | ||
Former [2016/19] | REFROIDISSEUR D'AIR DE CHARGE ET COLLECTEUR D'ADMISSION COMPRENANT CELUI-CI | Examination procedure | 14.08.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 26.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/20] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 19.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 07.10.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 07.10.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.10.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.08.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.08.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 26.01.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 26.01.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.02.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |