EP3000611 - RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2019/35] |
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sugiura, Takashi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Taguri, Ryo c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Arika c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kotake, Tomokazu c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Tanaka, Takatoshi c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Wang, Jun c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | WESER & Kollegen Patentanwälte PartmbB Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | [2019/35] |
Former [2016/13] | WESER & Kollegen Radeckestraße 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15002571.6 | 01.09.2015 | [2016/13] | Priority number, date | JP20140194374 | 24.09.2014 Original published format: JP 2014194374 | [2016/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3000611 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3000611 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/52, // B41M5/50 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M2205/42 (EP,US);
B41M5/502 (EP,US);
B41M5/506 (EP,US);
B41M5/508 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/13] | B41M5/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/45] |
Former [2016/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2016/13] | English: | RECORDING MEDIUM | [2016/13] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT | [2016/13] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/45] | 23.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2015 | AL | 28.08.2019 | AT | 28.08.2019 | CY | 28.08.2019 | CZ | 28.08.2019 | DK | 28.08.2019 | EE | 28.08.2019 | FI | 28.08.2019 | HR | 28.08.2019 | LT | 28.08.2019 | LV | 28.08.2019 | MC | 28.08.2019 | MK | 28.08.2019 | MT | 28.08.2019 | NL | 28.08.2019 | PL | 28.08.2019 | RO | 28.08.2019 | RS | 28.08.2019 | SE | 28.08.2019 | SI | 28.08.2019 | SK | 28.08.2019 | SM | 28.08.2019 | TR | 28.08.2019 | IE | 01.09.2019 | LU | 01.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | FR | 28.10.2019 | BG | 28.11.2019 | GB | 28.11.2019 | NO | 28.11.2019 | GR | 29.11.2019 | IS | 28.12.2019 | PT | 30.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 01.09.2015 | |
AL | 28.08.2019 | ||
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
MT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IE | 01.09.2019 | ||
LU | 01.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 28.10.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GB | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 01.09.2015 | |
AL | 28.08.2019 | ||
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IE | 01.09.2019 | ||
LU | 01.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 28.10.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GB | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CY | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IE | 01.09.2019 | ||
LU | 01.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 28.10.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GB | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IE | 01.09.2019 | ||
LU | 01.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
FR | 28.10.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
GB | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SI | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IE | 01.09.2019 | ||
LU | 01.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
IE | 01.09.2019 | ||
LU | 01.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LU | 01.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
SM | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
AT | 28.08.2019 | ||
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
PL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RO | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
DK | 28.08.2019 | ||
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
TR | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 28.08.2019 | |
FI | 28.08.2019 | ||
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
HR | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
RS | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
GR | 29.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
SE | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
PT | 30.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
NL | 28.08.2019 | ||
NO | 28.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 28.08.2019 | |
NO | 28.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0997314 (OJI PAPER CO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] * * the examples *; | [A]JP2007245426 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * the examples *; | [A]EP1842687 (OJI PAPER CO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0102] * * the examples *; | [A]JP2002362008 (HOKUETSU PAPER MILLS) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]JP2008246983 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * the examples * | Examination | JP2011218304 | EP0850777 | EP1977887 | by applicant | JP2007223306 | JP2012213924 | JPH07232473 | JPH08132731 | JPH0966664 | JPH0976628 |