17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
05.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
03.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
20.04.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
12.05.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] |
10.05.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
09.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.03.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
04.03.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
26.01.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.01.2017 |
Change - French title |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
28.10.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
28.10.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] |
21.10.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.04.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.04.2016 [2016/16] |
12.10.2015 |
Change - representative |
|