EP3159310 - METHOD FOR THE REDUCTION OF TRACE ELEMENTS IN WATER WITH ION EXCHANGE FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veolia Water Solutions & Technologies Support 1 Place Montgolfier Immeuble L'Aquarène 94410 Saint-Maurice / FR | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sauer, Uwe Alte Forstlahmer Str. 32 95326 Kulmbach / DE | 02 /
Seyfferth, Horst Richard-Wagner-Str. 34a 95444 Bayreuth / DE | 03 /
Hagen, Klaus 95326 Kulmbach / DE | [2023/12] |
Former [2017/17] | 01 /
Sauer, Uwe Alte Forstlahmer Str. 32 95326 Kulmbach / DE | ||
02 /
Seyfferth, Horst Richard-Wagner-Str. 34a 95444 Bayreuth / DE | |||
03 /
Hagen, Klaus Grünbaumer Str. 16 95326 Kulmbach / DE | Representative(s) | Patentanwaltskanzlei Methling Danziger Straße 20 23758 Wangels Hansühn / DE | [2023/12] |
Former [2017/17] | Patentanwaltskanzlei Methling Kaninenberghöhe 50 45136 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 15003035.1 | 23.10.2015 | [2017/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3159310 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3159310 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/42, // C02F101/10, C02F101/14, C02F101/16, C02F101/20, C02F101/22, C02F103/02 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
C02F1/42 (EP);
C02F1/283 (EP);
C02F2001/422 (EP);
C02F2001/425 (EP);
C02F2001/427 (EP);
C02F2101/006 (EP);
C02F2101/103 (EP);
C02F2101/105 (EP);
C02F2101/14 (EP);
C02F2101/16 (EP);
C02F2101/20 (EP);
C02F2101/203 (EP);
C02F2101/206 (EP);
C02F2101/22 (EP);
C02F2209/05 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/49] |
Former [2017/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUKTION VON SPURENELEMENTEN IN WASSER DURCH IONENAUSTAUSCHERFILTER | [2017/17] | English: | METHOD FOR THE REDUCTION OF TRACE ELEMENTS IN WATER WITH ION EXCHANGE FILTER | [2017/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION D'OLIGOÉLEMENTS DANS L'EAU PAR FILTRE ÉCHANGEUR D'IONS | [2017/17] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 09.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 14.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | RS | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | EE | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | EE | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | EE | 22.03.2023 | |
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 22.03.2023 | |
RS | 22.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5591346 (ETZEL JAMES E [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 7 - line 23 * * column 4, line 1 - line 20 * * column 4, line 40 - line 60 * * column 7, line 31 - line 37 * * figure 1 * [Y] 6-8,11-13 [I] 5; | [Y]EP0900765 (AWECO KUNSTSTOFFTECH GERAETE [DE]) [Y] 6,11 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6080315 (HAGEN KLAUS [DE], et al) [X] 16 * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 29 * * column 3, line 1 - line 5 * * claims 1,4 * * figure 1 * [Y] 8,12; | [X]US2005205495 (BARRETT JAMES H [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0026] , [0050] , [0153] - [0157] *; | [X]US2009020477 (DHEKANE GUNESH B [IN], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraphs [0004] , [0017] , [0022] , [0037] , [0038] *; | [XI]DE102010022120 (ATC ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES DR M [DE]) [X] 1,4,9,10 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0010] - [0013] - [0022] , [0023] * [I] 14,15; | [Y]US2010301882 (SOECKNICK RALF [DE], et al) [Y] 6,7 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0035] * * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]WO2015048907 (BIOTEQ ENVIRONMENTAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [Y] 13* paragraph [0105] * | Examination | US2002125195 | CN103464086 | US2015274545 | - DEMARCO M J ET AL, "Arsenic removal using a polymeric/inorganic hybrid sorbent", WATER RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030101), vol. 37, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0043-1354(02)00238-5, ISSN 0043-1354, pages 164 - 176, XP004390523 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0043-1354(02)00238-5 |