EP3148059 - ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR IMPREGNATING A WINDING BAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PETT & P.E.T.T. Trade & Industry Products GmbH Schlossgäßchen 4a 55288 Udenheim / DE | [2017/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETT, Bertram Schlossgässchen 4a 55288 Udenheim / DE | [2017/13] | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [2017/13] | Application number, filing date | 15003152.4 | 03.11.2015 | [2017/13] | Priority number, date | DE20151012441 | 28.09.2015 Original published format: DE102015012441 | [2017/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3148059 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/12 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
H02K15/12 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] |
Former [2017/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM IMPRÄGNIEREN EINES WICKLUNGSSTABES | [2017/13] | English: | ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR IMPREGNATING A WINDING BAR | [2017/13] | French: | AGENCEMENT ET PROCEDE D'IMPREGNATION D'UNE TIGE D'ENROULEMENT | [2017/13] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 03.11.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 09.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 27.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS61214750 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD) [X] 1-6,8-10 * paragraph [0003]; figures 1-4 * [A] 7; | [X]DE19962290 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * figures 4-6; claims 1-7 *; | [I]EP0077665 (BENTLEY HARRIS MFG CO [US]) [I] 1-6,8-10 * page 3, lines 13-34; figures 1-5 * * page 6, lines 19-32 * * page 9, lines 1-11 * | by applicant | EP1240705 | US2004098841 | US2010199465 | WO2015055265 |