Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8875527 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2014 | B2 | US2013284405 | 31.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0905870 | 03.04.2009 | US91046410 | 22.10.2010 | US201313927726 | 26.06.2013 | WO2010GB00665 | 01.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8479528 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2013 | B2 | US2011036107 | 17.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0905870 | 03.04.2009 | WO2010GB00665 | 01.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012523114 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0905870 | 03.04.2009 | WO2010GB00665 | 01.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2415334 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2015 | B1 | EP2415334 | 08.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0905870 | 03.04.2009 | WO2010GB00665 | 01.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102804944 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0905870 | 03.04.2009 | WO2010GB00665 | 01.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2925107 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0905870 | 03.04.2009 | EP10719760 | 01.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010112873 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0905870 | 03.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0905870D0 | 20.05.2009 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0905870 | 03.04.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1215777 | 09.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0905870 | 03.04.2009 | Type | Earlier application | EP2415334 |