EP2894322 - Cogeneration system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2015/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pecka, Kai Oelingrath 27 42855 Remscheid / DE | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Hocker, Thomas Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2015/29] | Application number, filing date | 15150270.5 | 07.01.2015 | [2015/29] | Priority number, date | DE201410200334 | 10.01.2014 Original published format: DE102014200334 | [2015/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2894322 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02G1/00 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
F02G1/043 (EP);
F24D18/00 (EP,US);
F02G2243/54 (EP);
F24D2101/00 (EP,US);
F24D2103/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kraft-Wärme-Kopplungssystem | [2015/29] | English: | Cogeneration system | [2015/29] | French: | Système de cogénération force/chaleur | [2015/29] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 16.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 24.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1069383 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1* paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0015]; figure 1; claim 5 *; | [X]DE19960966 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 60; figure 1; claim 10 *; | [X]US2003192323 (POESE MATHEW E [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0005]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0056] *; | [X]US2004093865 (WEILAND NATHAN THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0038]; figures 4,5 *; | [X]US2011252811 (ALDRAIHEM OSAMA J [SA]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0039]; figure 2 * |