Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12053600 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2024 | B2 | US2021085843 | 25.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP50235 | 07.01.2016 | EP15150306 | 07.01.2015 | US201715540598 | 29.06.2017 | US202017062698 | 05.10.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10835651 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2020 | B2 | US2018001003 | 04.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP50235 | 07.01.2016 | EP15150306 | 07.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230114322 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP50235 | 07.01.2016 | EP15150306 | 07.01.2015 | KR20177021924 | 07.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102558731B | Global Dossier | 24.07.2023 | B1 | KR20170103884 | 13.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP50235 | 07.01.2016 | EP15150306 | 07.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2023057131 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2020188409 | 12.11.2020 | EP15150306 | 07.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018501025 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP50235 | 07.01.2016 | EP15150306 | 07.01.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117224812 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP50235 | 07.01.2016 | EP15150306 | 07.01.2015 | CN201680005064 | 07.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117159884 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP50235 | 07.01.2016 | EP15150306 | 07.01.2015 | CN201680005064 | 07.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113262375B | Global Dossier | 29.09.2023 | B | CN113262375 | 17.08.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP50235 | 07.01.2016 | CN202110344694 | 07.01.2016 | EP15150306 | 07.01.2015 | CN201680005064 | 07.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107206219B | Global Dossier | 30.03.2021 | B | CN107206219 | 26.09.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP50235 | 07.01.2016 | EP15150306 | 07.01.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016110552 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15150306 | 07.01.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7229981B | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | B2 | JP2021035568 | 04.03.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | EP15150306 | 07.01.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3042684 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15150306 | 07.01.2015 |