EP2897367 - Methods and systems of storage level video fragment management [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fabrix TV Ltd 14 HaHaroshet Street Taya Building 2034 4365707 RaAnana / IL | [2015/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drang, Nir 2b/1 Hatchelet Street 4526432 Hod-HaSharon / IL | 02 /
Ben-Yakir, Ram 39A Shaar-HaYam Street 4660639 Herzlia / IL | 03 /
Ben-Shmuel, Nir 10 HaLivne Street 4481300 Oranit / IL | 04 /
Amiaz, Tomer 2 Rekanati Street 6949402 Tel-Aviv / IL | 05 /
Gonen, Eran 2 Levenberg Street 4465301 Kfar-Saba / IL | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Poccistrasse 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15151618.4 | 19.01.2015 | [2015/30] | Priority number, date | US201461929073P | 19.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461929073 P | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2897367 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/231, H04N21/2343, H04N21/658 | [2015/30] | CPC: |
H04N21/23439 (EP,US);
H04N21/23109 (EP,US);
H04N21/23113 (EP,US);
H04N21/234309 (EP,US);
H04N21/234345 (EP,US);
H04N21/6581 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Systeme zur Videofragmentverwaltung auf Speicherebene | [2015/30] | English: | Methods and systems of storage level video fragment management | [2015/30] | French: | Procédés et systèmes de gestion de fragment vidéo de niveau de stockage | [2015/30] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 23.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/29] | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002161911 (PINCKNEY THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 4-11 * paragraphs [0052] , [0 54] , [0 57] - [0061] *; | [A]US2004098463 (SHEN BO [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] *; | [XY]US2011088076 (LI HONGBING [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12,13 * abstract * * figures 1, 4, 5 * * paragraphs [0005] , [00 6] , [0 63] , [0 64] , [0 72] , [0 79] - [0082] * [Y] 4-11; | [A]WO2011106009 (MOBOVIVO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] *; | [A]WO2013184374 (APPLE INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract ** paragraphs [0017] - [0023] * |