EP2940681 - Display device and method for driving the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.11.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 17113, 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jae-Hoon 518-1702, 816, Geumha-ro, Geumcheon-gu 153-766 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Lee, Baek-Woon 1409-603,6, Dongcheon-ro 153beon-gil Suji-gu, Gyeonggi-do 448-914 Yongin-si / KR | 03 /
Kim, Jung-Taek 9-311,17, Olympic-ro 33-gil, Songpa-gu 138-793 Seoul / KR | 04 /
Song, Jae-Woo 805-101,88, Gwanpyeong-ro Dongan-gu, Gyeonggi-do 431-707 Anyang-si / KR | 05 /
Jung, Hae-Goo 603,53, Gongcheon-ro, Suji-gu, Gyeonggi-do 448-711 Yongin-si / KR | [2015/45] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2015/45] | Application number, filing date | 15151766.1 | 20.01.2015 | [2015/45] | Priority number, date | KR20140050629 | 28.04.2014 Original published format: KR 20140050629 | [2015/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2940681 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/20, G09G3/32 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
G09G3/20 (EP,US);
G09G3/3291 (US);
G09G3/2003 (US);
G09G3/2007 (US);
G09G3/3225 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0223 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0233 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0242 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0271 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2015/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung und Verfahren zur Ansteuerung davon | [2015/45] | English: | Display device and method for driving the same | [2015/45] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage et son procédé de commande | [2015/45] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 29.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/13] | 10.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/13] | 09.11.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1276094 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [Y] 3,11,12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0007]; figures 1-4 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0034] *; | [Y]US2007182672 (HOPPENBROUWERS JURGEN J L [NL], et al) [Y] 5-10,13-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US2010007587 (MILLER MICHAEL E [US]) [A] 5* paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0045] *; | [XY]US2010053137 (PARK KYONG-TAE [KR], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0072]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 3,5-15; | [X]EP2722842 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 2 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0068]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-4 * |