Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.12.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
18.01.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
17.06.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
17.06.2016 | Change - designated states | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
06.11.2015 | Publication of search report | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
06.11.2015 | Change - classification | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
06.11.2015 | Change - classification | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
28.08.2015 | Change - German title | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] |
28.08.2015 | Change - English title | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] |
28.08.2015 | Change - French title | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] |
04.08.2015 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
22.06.2015 | Change - representative | |
29.01.2015 | Change - representative |