EP2900005 - Including a packet-switched parameter in a message [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2015/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Russell, Nicholas James 31 Barn Crescent Newbury Berkshire RG14 6HD / GB | 02 /
Burbidge, Richard Charles 11 Ravenscroft Hook Hampshire RG27 9NP / GB | [2015/31] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/16] | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | ||
Former [2015/31] | Fennell, Gareth Charles, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15152941.9 | 28.01.2015 | [2015/31] | Priority number, date | US201414166128 | 28.01.2014 Original published format: US201414166128 | [2015/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2900005 | Date: | 29.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2900005 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/18, // H04W8/12, H04W8/14, H04W48/18, H04W48/00 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
H04W8/18 (EP,CN,US);
H04W8/12 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/31] | H04W8/08, // H04W8/12, H04W8/14, H04W48/18, H04W48/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2015/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Einfügen eines paketvermittelten Parameters in eine Nachricht | [2015/31] | English: | Including a packet-switched parameter in a message | [2015/31] | French: | Inclusion d'un paramètre de commutation par paquets dans un message | [2015/31] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 01.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.09.2018 | 25.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2015 | AL | 17.04.2019 | AT | 17.04.2019 | CY | 17.04.2019 | CZ | 17.04.2019 | DK | 17.04.2019 | EE | 17.04.2019 | ES | 17.04.2019 | FI | 17.04.2019 | HR | 17.04.2019 | IT | 17.04.2019 | LT | 17.04.2019 | LV | 17.04.2019 | MC | 17.04.2019 | MK | 17.04.2019 | MT | 17.04.2019 | PL | 17.04.2019 | RO | 17.04.2019 | RS | 17.04.2019 | SE | 17.04.2019 | SI | 17.04.2019 | SK | 17.04.2019 | SM | 17.04.2019 | TR | 17.04.2019 | BG | 17.07.2019 | NO | 17.07.2019 | GR | 18.07.2019 | IS | 17.08.2019 | PT | 17.08.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 28.01.2015 | |
AL | 17.04.2019 | ||
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
MT | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
SM | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
DK | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
RS | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
SE | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
FI | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
NO | 17.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2012079084 (FORSSELL MIKA [FI], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0082] * * figure 1 * [Y] 2-13; | [Y]US2013337808 (ZHAO SULI [US], et al) [Y] 2-13 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0049] * * figures 4, 5 *; | [A]US8467782 (FACCIN STEFANO [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 48 * * column 10, line 26 - column 12, line 53 * * column 14, line 43 - column 15, line 26 * * figure 4 *; | [A] - GEMALTO N V ET AL, "Discussion paper on APN storage in UICC", vol. SA WG1, no. Zagreb, Croatia; 20130819 - 20130823, (20131015), 3GPP DRAFT; S1-134014, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/SA/SA1/Docsstatus/docs/, (20131015), XP050743278 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | US2013003697 | US2008285492 | CN103379463 | - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; General Packet Radio Service (GPRS); Service description; Stage 2 (Release 12)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.060, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20131213), vol. SA WG2, no. V12.3.0, pages 1 - 344, XP050728757 |