EP3051039 - Building system, in particular for residential and professional purposes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brauer, Matthias Schopstrasse 15 20255 Hamburg / DE | For all designated states Thieleke, Jörg An der Eiche 11 19339 Plattenburg OT Glöwen / DE | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brauer, Matthias Schopstr. 15 20255 Hamburg / DE | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | Meyer, Ludgerus Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2016/31] | Application number, filing date | 15153231.4 | 30.01.2015 | [2016/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3051039 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E04H1/12, // E02D5/80, E04H12/22, E04B1/00 | [2016/31] | CPC: |
E04H1/1205 (EP);
E04H1/1272 (EP);
E04B1/003 (EP);
E04B1/34321 (EP);
E04B2001/0092 (EP);
E04H12/2223 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gebäudesystem, insbesondere für Wohn- und Arbeitszwecke | [2016/31] | English: | Building system, in particular for residential and professional purposes | [2016/31] | French: | Système de bâtiments, en particulier à usage professionnel ou résidentiel | [2016/31] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 14.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2017/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4158941 (DIANA SILVIO [US]) [A] 1-5,11,12 * column 2, line 25 - column 10, line 67; figures 1-12 *; | [A]US4275534 (PORTER WILLIAM H) [A] 1,5,6 * column 2, line 30 - column 6, line 5; figures 1-13 *; | [A]US2007245640 (BERGQVIST TONNY [AU]) [A] 1,3-5 * page 2, column r, paragraph 35 - paragraph 37; figures 1A,2A *; | [A]DE1958729 (SCHUMACHER JUN RAMON) [A] 1,12,13 * figures 1-5 * |