EP2913514 - MOBILE HYDRAULIC CONSTRUCTION MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/36] | MOBILE HYDRAULIC CONSTRUCTION MACHINE | ||
[2024/08] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Hydraulikbagger GmbH Liebherrstrasse 12 88457 Kirchdorf/Iller / DE | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meier, Simon Am Sportplatz 1 87700 Amendingen / DE | 02 /
Meitinger, Bernhard Krautgässle 9A 87740 Buxheim / DE | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2015/36] | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15153475.7 | 02.02.2015 | [2015/36] | Priority number, date | DE20141001369 | 03.02.2014 Original published format: DE102014001369 | [2015/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2913514 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2913514 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02N7/00, B60R16/08, E02F9/20, E02F9/22, // F02N7/08, B60K6/12 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
F02N7/00 (EP);
B60K6/12 (EP);
E02F9/2066 (EP);
E02F9/2217 (EP);
E02F9/226 (EP);
E02F9/2296 (EP);
B60K2006/126 (EP);
B60W2300/17 (EP);
F02N7/08 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/36] | F02N9/04, E02F9/22, B60R16/08, F02N7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] | Title | German: | MOBILE HYDRAULISCHE BAUMASCHINE | [2015/36] | English: | MOBILE HYDRAULIC CONSTRUCTION MACHINE | [2024/11] | French: | MACHINE HYDRAULIQUE MOBILE | [2024/11] |
Former [2015/36] | MOBILE HYDRAULIC CONSTRUCTION MACHINE | ||
Former [2015/36] | MACHINE HYDRAULIQUE MOBILE | Examination procedure | 02.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/36] | 29.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   12.03.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE1006732 (IRION & VOSSELER, et al) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 14; figure 1 * * column 2, line 38 - line 46 * [A] 9 [Y] 4-7,10; | [XYI]US3892283 (JOHNSON JOHN W) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 35; figure - * * column 5, line 9 - line 18 * [Y] 4-7 [I] 11; | [Y]DE19852039 (SAUER SUNDSTRAND GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 4-7,10* figure - *; | [XAYI]EP2308795 (LINDE MATERIAL HANDLING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,8 * paragraphs [0003] , [0017] , [0031] , [0052] , [0055] - [0057] - [0060]; figure - * [A] 9 [Y] 4-7,10 [I] 5,7,11; | [XAYI]WO2012125798 (LOWMAN ROGER [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0015] , [0 24] , [0025]; figure - * [A] 9 [Y] 4-7 [I] 11; | [XAYI]JP2013091953 (SUGIMURA NOBUYUKI, et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0014]; figure 1 * [A] 9 [Y] 4-7,10 [I] 2,3,11 |