EP3050951 - Method of dishwashing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2016/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Letzelter, Nathalie Sophie P.O. Box Forrest Hall N2 Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Ltd Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB | 02 /
Solache Leon, Fernando P.O. Box Forrest Hall N2 Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Ltd Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB | 03 /
Urquhart, Claire P.O. Box Forrest Hall N2 Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB | [2016/31] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Belgium UK N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Yorquez Ramirez, Maria Isabel Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 15153515.0 | 02.02.2015 | [2016/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3050951 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/20, C11D17/06, C11D3/33, C11D17/00, C11D17/04, C11D3/39 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
C11D3/33 (EP,US);
C11D3/3932 (US);
C11D17/0091 (EP,US);
C11D17/044 (US);
C11D17/045 (EP,US);
C11D17/06 (US);
C11D3/2086 (US);
C11D3/37 (US);
C11D3/3905 (US);
C11D3/3907 (US);
C11D3/3917 (US);
C11D3/392 (US);
|
Former IPC [2016/31] | C11D3/39, C11D3/33, C11D17/00, C11D17/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2016/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Geschirrspülen | [2016/31] | English: | Method of dishwashing | [2016/31] | French: | Procédé de lavage de vaisselle | [2016/31] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 05.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/48] | 22.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO9528464 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [I] 1,4,5,9-13 * page 61, lines 1-2; example 2; claims 1, 12, 13 * * page 55, line 5 *; | [X]DE19518695 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,9,10,12,13 * examples I, II, IV-VI, VIII; claims 1-11 *; | [XI]WO2012025740 (RECKITT BENCKISER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,10,12-15 * capsule 3 *; page 14, lines 16, 17; example 2; claims 1-12, 14 * [I] 6,8; | [I]WO2012085534 (RECKITT BENCKISER NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-5,11-15 * claims 1, 24 * * page 9, lines 11, 21-23 * * page 10, lines 1-24 * * page 17, lines 39, 40 ** page 18, line 20 *; | [I]DE102013010150 (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH]) [I] 1-5,11,12 * granules 3 and 4 *; paragraphs [0044] , [0 45] , [0 47]; claim 10; tables I, II * | by applicant | US3629121 | US3803285 | US3929107 | US4141841 | WO9001815 | WO9108281 | US5308532 | WO9422800 | WO9530733 | WO9623873 | WO9700324 | US5856164 | WO9923211 | US6093562 | EP1022334 | WO0060060 | WO2005080542 | WO2005090541 | WO2006002643 | US7153818 | WO2008010925 | WO2009040545 | - "Methods for Ascertaining the Cleaning Performance of Dishwasher Detergents, (Part B, updated 2005", SOFW-JOURNAL, (200608), vol. 132, page 35 |