EP2905635 - Geophysical cable preparation for antifouling paint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2022 [2022/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PGS Geophysical AS P O Box 251 Lilleaker 0216 Oslo / NO | [2015/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harrick, Bruce William 18911 Cove Bend Lane Cypress, TX 77433 / US | [2015/33] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 15153566.3 | 03.02.2015 | [2015/33] | Priority number, date | US201461937267P | 07.02.2014 Original published format: US 201461937267 P | US201414506013 | 03.10.2014 Original published format: US201414506013 | [2015/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2905635 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2905635 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01V1/38, G01V13/00 | [2015/33] | CPC: |
G01V1/38 (EP,US);
G01V1/3843 (US);
B05D3/10 (US);
B05D3/108 (US);
G01V13/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] |
Former [2015/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Geophysikalische Kabelvorbereitung für fäulnisverhindernde Anstriche | [2015/33] | English: | Geophysical cable preparation for antifouling paint | [2015/33] | French: | Préparation de câble de géophysique pour peinture antisalissure | [2015/33] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 31.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/06] | 24.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2444604 (PGS GEOPHYSICAL AS [NO]) [A] 1-6,14-17* the whole document *; | [A]EP2348078 (PGS GEOPHYSICAL AS [NO]) [A] 1-6,14-17 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2015088352 (MAGSEIS AS [NO]) [E] 1-6,14-16 * figures 4,6 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] * * paragraphs [0021] , [0023] , [0024] , [0038] * * paragraphs [0043] , [0052] , [0055] , [0073] * | by applicant | US2012176860 |