EP2908160 - Optical fiber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawaguchi, Yuki c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Yoshinori c/o Yokohama Works of Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 1, Taya-cho, Sakae-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/34] | Application number, filing date | 15153774.3 | 04.02.2015 | [2015/34] | Priority number, date | JP20140024168 | 12.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014024168 | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2908160 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/036 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
G02B6/03627 (EP,CN,US);
C03B2203/23 (EP,US);
G02B6/02019 (EP,CN,US);
G02B6/03611 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Glasfaser | [2015/34] | English: | Optical fiber | [2015/34] | French: | Fibre optique | [2015/34] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/37] | 08.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2009123122 (MUKASA KAZUNORI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-7,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0027]; figure 1; example 2; table 1 * [Y] 9-11 [I] 4,8; | [XYI]JP2003262752 (FUJIKURA LTD) [X] 1-7,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0013] - [0021] - [0024]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 9-11 [I] 8; | [Y]US2009263091 (KUMANO NAOMI [JP]) [Y] 9-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0033] - [0037]; figure 2 * | by applicant | JP2011197667 |