Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9266624 | Global Dossier | 23.02.2016 | B2 | US2015239580 | 27.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414189828 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6652322B | Global Dossier | 19.02.2020 | B2 | JP2015162249 | 07.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414189828 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104865865B | Global Dossier | 06.11.2018 | B | CN104865865 | 26.08.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414189828 | 25.02.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2913731 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2017 | B1 | EP2913731 | 02.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414189828 | 25.02.2014 |