EP2896632 - Material and methods for treating or preventing HER-3 associated diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daiichi Sankyo Europe GmbH Zielstattstr. 48 81379 München / DE | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, California 91320-1799 / US | [2017/13] |
Former [2015/30] | For all designated states U3 Pharma GmbH Fraunhoferstrasse 22 82152 Martinsried / DE | ||
For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, California 91320-1799 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hettmann, Thore Adelaarsstraat 11 9051 Sint-Denijs-Westrem / BE | 02 /
Freeman, Daniel, J. 947 Grayrock Street Newbury Park, CA 91320 / US | 03 /
Radinsky, Robert 3574 Lang Ranch Parkway Thousand Oaks, CA 91362 / US | [2015/30] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2017/43] |
Former [2015/30] | Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15154165.3 | 12.11.2010 | [2015/30] | Priority number, date | US20090261149P | 13.11.2009 Original published format: US 261149 P | [2015/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2896632 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2896632 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | [2015/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2896632 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K16/30, C07K16/32 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
A61K39/39558 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K39/395 (KR,US);
C07K16/40 (US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,KR,US);
A61K38/17 (KR);
A61K38/18 (KR);
A61K38/19 (KR);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K47/6851 (US);
A61K47/6871 (EP,US);
A61N5/10 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/435 (KR);
C07K14/475 (KR);
C07K16/18 (KR);
C07K16/22 (KR);
C07K16/24 (KR);
C07K16/28 (KR);
C07K16/2863 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K16/30 (KR);
C07K16/32 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
A61K2039/507 (EP,US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (US);
C07K2317/31 (US);
C07K2317/54 (US);
C07K2317/55 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2317/626 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] | Title | German: | Material und Verfahren zur Behandlung oder Vorbeugung von HER-3-assoziierten Erkrankungen | [2015/30] | English: | Material and methods for treating or preventing HER-3 associated diseases | [2015/30] | French: | Matériau et procédés de traitement ou de prévention de maladies associées à des HER-3 | [2015/30] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 27.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10785251.9 / EP2499162 | EP13189092.3 / EP2719708 | Divisional application(s) | EP17197711.9 / EP3351558 | EP20151640.8 / EP3670539 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2010 | AL | 25.10.2017 | AT | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | DK | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | HR | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | NL | 25.10.2017 | PL | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | RS | 25.10.2017 | SE | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | IE | 12.11.2017 | LU | 12.11.2017 | MT | 12.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | BG | 25.01.2018 | NO | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.11.2010 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
MT | 12.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 12.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 25.10.2017 | |
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NL | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 25.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2007077028 (U3 PHARMA AG [DE], et al); | [XI]WO2008100624 (MERRIMACK PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [E]WO2011022727 (MERRIMACK PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | by applicant | US4046878 | EP0056692 | US4399216 | US4471052 | EP0137145 | US4740461 | US4816397 | US4816567 | US4912040 | US4939168 | US4959455 | JPH0368180B | JPH0368506B | JPH0368507B | EP0463151 | WO9203918 | WO9222645 | WO9222647 | WO9222670 | EP0546073 | WO9312227 | WO9400569 | WO9402602 | WO9425585 | EP0639577 | WO9526961 | WO9601259 | WO9614436 | US5545806 | US5545807 | US5569825 | WO9634096 | US5591669 | US5612205 | WO9713852 | US5625126 | US5625825 | EP0773288 | US5633425 | US5643763 | US5661016 | US5681847 | US5721367 | US5747498 | EP0843961 | WO9824893 | WO9824884 | US5770429 | US5789215 | US5789650 | US5814318 | US5821246 | US5874299 | US5877397 | US5916771 | US5939598 | US5981175 | US6023010 | US6075181 | US6114598 | US6150584 | US6162963 | WO0076310 | US6204388 | US6207418 | US6255458 | US6303342 | WO03013602 | US2003104625 | WO03048730 | US2003217373 | US6673986 | WO2004011900 | WO2004091384 | US6833268 | WO2005003707 | US2008124345 | US7435871 | US7547781 | US7557182 | US19960759620 |