EP3054158 - METHOD FOR STOPPING A HERMETIC REFRIGERANT COMPRESSOR AND CONTROL SYSTEM FOR SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nidec Global Appliance Germany GmbH Mads-Clausen-Strasse 7 24939 Flensburg / DE | [2018/18] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states Secop GmbH Mads-Clausen-Strasse 7 24939 Flensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gries, Ulrich, Dr. Ottenser Marktplatz 13 22765 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Brune, Fabian Südergraben 37 24937 Flensburg / DE | 03 /
Petersen, Per Tranekjer Borggarde 1/2. TH 6300 Graasten / DK | [2016/32] | Representative(s) | KLIMENT & HENHAPEL Patentanwälte OG Gonzagagasse 15/2 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/32] | KLIMENT & HENHAPEL Patentanwälte OG Singerstrasse 8/3/9 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 15154373.3 | 09.02.2015 | [2016/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3054158 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F04B35/04, F04B39/00, F04B49/02, F04B49/06, F04B49/10 | [2016/32] | CPC: |
F04B35/04 (EP);
F04B39/0027 (EP);
F04B49/02 (EP);
F04B49/06 (EP);
F04B49/103 (EP);
F04B2201/127 (EP);
F04B2203/0204 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] |
Former [2016/32] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANHALTEN EINES HERMETISCH GEKAPSELTEN KÄTEMITTELVERDICHTERS UND STEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR DIESEN | [2016/32] | English: | METHOD FOR STOPPING A HERMETIC REFRIGERANT COMPRESSOR AND CONTROL SYSTEM FOR SAME | [2016/32] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ARRÊT D'UN COMPRESSEUR HERMÉTIQUE DE RÉFRIGÉRANT ET SON SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE | [2016/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 08.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2018 | Observations by third parties | 18.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2018 | Observations by third parties | 17.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/40] | 24.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2014072451 (SCHWARZ MARCOS GUILHERME [BR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,18-21 * figure 6 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] * * claim 1 * [A] 3,5-17; | [A]EP2759788 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0074] * * claims 10-12 *; | [A]US6051952 (MOREIRA JULIO C [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 12, line 17 - column 13, line 12 * * figures 1-3, 9 * | by applicant | EP2669519 | other | EP2669519 | - Anonymous, "XV Controllers Attached Electronic Unit", Secop Operating Instructions 105N5020 Electronic Unit-XV- AEO/Freq. 160-264 V/50/60 Hz, (20141100), pages 1 - 35, XP055542082 |