EP2921607 - Device for attaching a panel in a support rail [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SB Ingénierie 76, Chemin des Poses 74330 Poisy / FR | [2016/40] |
Former [2015/39] | For all designated states SB Ingénierie 76, Chemin des Poses BP 18 74330 Poisy / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giacometti, Sylviane 74 impasse des Creuses 74330 Choisy / FR | 02 /
Dagand, Cyril 6 impasse des Hutins 74150 Rumilly / FR | [2017/02] |
Former [2015/39] | 01 /
Giacometti, Sylviane 74 impasse des creuses 74330 Choisy / FR | ||
02 /
Dagand, Cyril 6 impasse des Hutins 74150 Rumilly / FR | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/02] | Gevers & Orès 41 avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2015/39] | Hecké, Gérard Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 15154377.4 | 09.02.2015 | [2015/39] | Priority number, date | FR20140000483 | 26.02.2014 Original published format: FR 1400483 | [2015/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2921607 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2921607 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2921607 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E04F11/18 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
E04F11/1853 (EP,US);
F16B5/0685 (EP,US);
E04F11/1812 (EP,US);
F16B2/14 (US);
E04F2011/1823 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7064 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7067 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/39] | E04F11/18, // F16B2/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2015/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Befestigen eines Paneels in einer Halteschiene | [2015/39] | English: | Device for attaching a panel in a support rail | [2015/39] | French: | Dispositif de fixation d'un panneau dans un rail support | [2015/39] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 08.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.01.2017 | AT | 11.01.2017 | CY | 11.01.2017 | CZ | 11.01.2017 | EE | 11.01.2017 | FI | 11.01.2017 | HR | 11.01.2017 | LT | 11.01.2017 | LV | 11.01.2017 | MC | 11.01.2017 | MK | 11.01.2017 | MT | 11.01.2017 | NL | 11.01.2017 | RS | 11.01.2017 | SE | 11.01.2017 | SI | 11.01.2017 | SK | 11.01.2017 | SM | 11.01.2017 | LU | 09.02.2017 | BG | 11.04.2017 | NO | 11.04.2017 | IS | 11.05.2017 | PT | 11.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2019/52] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MK | 11.01.2017 | ||
MT | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
LU | 09.02.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MT | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
LU | 09.02.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MT | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
LU | 09.02.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
LU | 09.02.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
LU | 09.02.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE102009008307 (JOH SPRINZ GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * paragraphs [0003] , [0011] , [0019] , [0034] , [0035] , [0039] , [0040] * * figures 2a,2b,2c,4 *; | [A]WO2013121330 (METALGLAS BONOMI S R L [IT]) [A] 1-10 * figures 2,2a,2b,3 *; | [AD]FR2930270 (OLIVIER JACQUES [FR]) [AD] 1-10 * figure 2 *; | [AD]EP1647663 (OBERHOFER ALFONS [AT]) [AD] 1-10 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE202010016187U (BANGRATZ RENE [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE202007009239U (BANGRATZ RENE [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP1647663 | FR2930270 | DE102009008307 |