EP2894441 - Fuel dispenser flow meter sensor fraud prevention [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gilbarco Inc. 7300 West Friendly Avenue Greensboro, NC 27410 / US | [2019/10] |
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states Danaher Uk Industries Limited Suite 31 The Quadrant 99 Parkway Avenue Sheffield, South Yorkshire S9 4WG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jennings, Michael Lawrence 48 West Park Crecent Billericay Essex CM12 9EG / GB | [2015/29] | Representative(s) | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Gray, James, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15154732.0 | 08.12.2011 | [2015/29] | Priority number, date | US20100421011P | 08.12.2010 Original published format: US 421011 P | US201113313894 | 07.12.2011 Original published format: US201113313894 | [2015/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2894441 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2894441 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01F13/00, G01F15/00, G01F15/075, B67D7/34 | [2015/29] | CPC: |
G01F13/00 (EP,CN,US);
B67D7/04 (EP,US);
B67D7/32 (EP,US);
B67D7/344 (CN);
G01F15/007 (EP,CN,US);
G01F15/075 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/29] | Title | German: | Betrugsverhinderung für Zapfsäulendurchflussmessersensor | [2015/29] | English: | Fuel dispenser flow meter sensor fraud prevention | [2015/29] | French: | Prévention des fraudes de capteur de mesure de débit de distribution de carburant | [2015/29] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 15.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11794717.6 / EP2649420 | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2011 | AL | 31.10.2018 | AT | 31.10.2018 | CY | 31.10.2018 | CZ | 31.10.2018 | DK | 31.10.2018 | EE | 31.10.2018 | ES | 31.10.2018 | FI | 31.10.2018 | HR | 31.10.2018 | LT | 31.10.2018 | LV | 31.10.2018 | MC | 31.10.2018 | MK | 31.10.2018 | NL | 31.10.2018 | PL | 31.10.2018 | RO | 31.10.2018 | RS | 31.10.2018 | SE | 31.10.2018 | SI | 31.10.2018 | SK | 31.10.2018 | SM | 31.10.2018 | TR | 31.10.2018 | IE | 08.12.2018 | LU | 08.12.2018 | MT | 08.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | FR | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | BG | 31.01.2019 | NO | 31.01.2019 | GR | 01.02.2019 | IS | 28.02.2019 | PT | 01.03.2019 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/17] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
TR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
MT | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
MT | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SI | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
FR | 31.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
MC | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SK | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.12.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
EE | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RO | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
SM | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
DK | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 31.10.2018 | |
AT | 31.10.2018 | ||
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
PT | 01.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
RS | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
SE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
GR | 01.02.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 31.10.2018 | |
ES | 31.10.2018 | ||
FI | 31.10.2018 | ||
HR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
LV | 31.10.2018 | ||
NL | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
PL | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 31.01.2019 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 31.10.2018 | |
LT | 31.10.2018 | ||
NO | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 31.10.2018 | |
NO | 31.01.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0626566 (CONTADORES DE AGUA DE ZARAGOZA [ES]) [A] 1-7 * column 6, lines 10-21 * * column 13, lines 7-13 * * column 13, line 19 - column 14, line l; figure - ** claims 4-6 *; | [A]US5596501 (COMER TIMOTHY J [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 4, lines 14-23 * * column 9, lines 1-19; figure 3 * | by applicant | US5447062 | US5689071 | US5954080 | US6250151 | US6397686 | US6435204 | US7111520 | US2006260680 | US7546778 | US2010122990 | US7946309 |