EP2907437 - Robot cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2021/14] |
Former [2015/34] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Kyoung Woung 200-55, Dongmyeong-dong, Dong-gu Gwangju / KR | 02 /
Lee, Kyu Ha 316-1501, Hoban Regencyville Apt., Sanwol-dong Gwangsan-gu Gwangju / KR | 03 /
Han, Seung Il 8507-401, e-Pyeonhansesang Apt., Iui-dong Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2015/34] | Application number, filing date | 15154740.3 | 11.02.2015 | [2015/34] | Priority number, date | KR20140016838 | 13.02.2014 Original published format: KR 20140016838 | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2907437 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2907437 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | [2015/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2907437 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/04 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
A47L9/0411 (EP,US);
A47L11/24 (US);
A47L11/4041 (US);
A47L11/4044 (US);
A47L11/4069 (US);
A47L9/0427 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/14] |
Former [2015/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Reinigungsroboter | [2015/34] | English: | Robot cleaner | [2015/34] | French: | Robot nettoyeur | [2015/34] | Examination procedure | 24.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/14] | 06.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.02.2015 | AL | 14.04.2021 | AT | 14.04.2021 | CY | 14.04.2021 | CZ | 14.04.2021 | DK | 14.04.2021 | EE | 14.04.2021 | ES | 14.04.2021 | FI | 14.04.2021 | HR | 14.04.2021 | IT | 14.04.2021 | LT | 14.04.2021 | LV | 14.04.2021 | MC | 14.04.2021 | MK | 14.04.2021 | NL | 14.04.2021 | PL | 14.04.2021 | RO | 14.04.2021 | RS | 14.04.2021 | SE | 14.04.2021 | SI | 14.04.2021 | SK | 14.04.2021 | SM | 14.04.2021 | BG | 14.07.2021 | NO | 14.07.2021 | GR | 15.07.2021 | IS | 14.08.2021 | PT | 16.08.2021 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 11.02.2015 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CY | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 11.02.2015 | |
AL | 14.04.2021 | ||
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
MC | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SI | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 14.04.2021 | |
AT | 14.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
EE | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RO | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SK | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
CZ | 14.04.2021 | ||
DK | 14.04.2021 | ||
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
SM | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
PL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
ES | 14.04.2021 | ||
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
RS | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
IS | 14.08.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
PT | 16.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
HR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
LV | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
SE | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.07.2021 | ||
GR | 15.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | ||
NL | 14.04.2021 | ||
BG | 14.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 14.04.2021 | |
FI | 14.04.2021 | ||
LT | 14.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1604603 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 3, paragraph 16 - column 6, paragraph 41 * * figures 4-7 *; | [Y]US7827653 (LIU CHUN-HSIEN [TW], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 1 - line 11 * * column 1, line 27 - line 32 * * column 2, line 49 - line 55 * * column 3, line 46 - line 50 * * column 5, line 1 - line 64 * * figures 1-6 *; | [Y]EP2417892 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 1, paragraph 5 - paragraph 6 * * column 2, paragraph 15 * * column 3, paragraph 18 - column 6, paragraph 56 * * figures 1-9 *; | [A]US2012085190 (FU WANDA [CN]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** figures 1-7 * |