EP2908296 - Method for detecting thefts inside shops [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bua, Salvatore Via Pugerna 50 6822 Arogno / CH | [2015/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/34] | Representative(s) | Fabiano, Piero, et al Fabiano, Franke & MGT Sagl Piazzetta San Carlo, 2 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/34] | Fabiano, Piero Fabiano, Franke & MGT Sagl Riva Caccia 1D 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 15155412.8 | 17.02.2015 | [2015/34] | Priority number, date | CH20140000214 | 18.02.2014 Original published format: CH 2142014 | IT2014RM00134 | 14.03.2014 Original published format: IT RM20140134 | [2015/34] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2908296 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2908296 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/19, G08B13/196, G08B13/193 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
G08B13/194 (EP,US);
G08B13/22 (US);
G08B13/19613 (EP,US);
H04N7/18 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] |
Former [2015/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Diebstahldetektierung innerhalb Kaufläden | [2015/34] | English: | Method for detecting thefts inside shops | [2015/34] | French: | Procédé pour la détection du vol dans des magasins | [2015/34] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 10.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.11.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2015 | AL | 10.04.2019 | AT | 10.04.2019 | CY | 10.04.2019 | CZ | 10.04.2019 | DK | 10.04.2019 | EE | 10.04.2019 | ES | 10.04.2019 | FI | 10.04.2019 | HR | 10.04.2019 | LT | 10.04.2019 | LV | 10.04.2019 | MC | 10.04.2019 | MK | 10.04.2019 | MT | 10.04.2019 | NL | 10.04.2019 | PL | 10.04.2019 | RO | 10.04.2019 | RS | 10.04.2019 | SE | 10.04.2019 | SI | 10.04.2019 | SK | 10.04.2019 | SM | 10.04.2019 | TR | 10.04.2019 | BG | 10.07.2019 | NO | 10.07.2019 | GR | 11.07.2019 | IS | 10.08.2019 | PT | 10.09.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 17.02.2015 | |
AL | 10.04.2019 | ||
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CY | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
MT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
SM | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
AT | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RS | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 10.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007118324 (GULATI SANDEEP [US]) [I] 1-10* paragraphs [0001] - [0008] - [0010] - [0018] - [0026] - [0029] - [0065] , [0066] , [0081] , [0085]; figures 1-3 * | Examination | US2012008819 | US8448858 |