08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
14.02.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
13.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
27.09.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44] |
10.04.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
08.03.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
02.03.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
25.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.02.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.02.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
25.11.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.04.2018 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
24.02.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.02.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.02.2017 |
First examination report |
|
26.02.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] |
26.02.2016 |
Change - designated states |
published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] |
23.02.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.08.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
17.04.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
19.02.2015 |
Change - representative |
|