EP2910491 - Spray head for a liquid container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coster Tecnologie Speciali S.p.A. Viale Trento, 2 38050 Calceranica al Lago (Trento) / IT | [2015/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geier, Adalbert Via N. Falzolgher 53 38123 Villazzano-Trento / IT | [2015/35] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/35] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15155610.7 | 18.02.2015 | [2015/35] | Priority number, date | DE201410102153 | 20.02.2014 Original published format: DE102014102153 | [2015/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2910491 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/20 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
B65D83/206 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sprühkopf für einen Flüssigkeitsbehälter | [2015/35] | English: | Spray head for a liquid container | [2015/35] | French: | Tête de pulvérisation pour un récipient à liquide | [2015/35] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE102012200545 (APTAR RADOLFZELL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5-10 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0065]; figure - * [Y] 4; | [XDY]EP1118554 (COSTER TECNOLOGIE SPECIALI SPA [IT]) [XD] 1-3,6-8,10 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0026]; figure - * [Y] 4; | [Y]DE69800746T (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 4 * page 5, line 10 - page 5, line 16 * | by applicant | EP1118554 | DE69800746T |