EP3058973 - SUPPLEMENTAL DEVICE FOR REMOVABLE ATTACHMENT TO A MEDICAMENT INJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Brüningstraße 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2016/34] | Application number, filing date | 15155756.8 | 19.02.2015 | [2016/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3058973 | Date: | 24.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/31 | [2016/34] | CPC: |
A61M5/31 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/3157 (CN,US);
A61M5/31568 (CN,US);
G06V30/153 (US);
H04N23/63 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3126 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/3306 (CN,US);
A61M2205/3569 (CN,US);
A61M2205/505 (CN,US);
A61M2205/52 (CN,US);
A61M2205/6063 (CN,US);
A61M2205/8206 (CN,US);
G06V2201/034 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSÄTZVORRICHTUNG ZUR LÖSBAREN BEFESTIGUNG AN EINER ARZNEIMITTELEINSPRITZVORRICHTUNG | [2016/34] | English: | SUPPLEMENTAL DEVICE FOR REMOVABLE ATTACHMENT TO A MEDICAMENT INJECTION DEVICE | [2016/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF SUPPLÉMENTAIRE POUR UNE FIXATION AMOVIBLE À UN DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE MÉDICAMENT | [2016/34] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2017/04] | 22.09.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013120776 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7,11,12 * abstract * * claim 1 * * page 9, line 31 - page 10, line 5 * * page 16, line 1 * * figures 2c,5b,10,12 * [I] 3,8-10; | [XI]WO2014023763 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * claim - * * figure - * [I] 2-11; | [XI]WO2014111341 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * claim - * * figure - *[I] 2-11 |