EP2902199 - A jig for fitting a printing screen to or removing a printing screen from a frame unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASM Assembly Systems Switzerland GmbH Hardturmstrasse 105 8005 Zürich / CH | [2015/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shaw, Fraser 4 Old Station Wynde Troon, Ayrshire KA10 6RR / GB | 02 /
Hall, James Graham 9 Southwood Road Troon, Ayrshire KA10 7ER / GB | 03 /
Piatek, Richard Andre Conkers Upton Fort Road Osmington Mills Weymouth, Dorset DT3 6HH / GB | [2015/32] | Representative(s) | Boden, Keith McMurray Fry Heath & Spence LLP Unit A, Faraday Court Faraday Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB | [2018/01] |
Former [2015/32] | Boden, Keith McMurray Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15155842.6 | 04.11.2004 | [2015/32] | Priority number, date | GB20030026065 | 07.11.2003 Original published format: GB 0326065 | [2015/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2902199 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2902199 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B41F15/36 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
B41F15/36 (EP,GB,US);
B41M1/12 (GB);
H05K3/12 (GB);
H05K3/1225 (EP,GB,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/52] |
Former [2015/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Einspannvorrichtung zum Anbringen eines Drucksiebs an einer Rahmeneinheit oder Entfernen eines Drucksiebs von einer Rahmeneinheit | [2015/32] | English: | A jig for fitting a printing screen to or removing a printing screen from a frame unit | [2015/32] | French: | Gabarit de montage d'un écran d'impression ou de retirer un écran d'impression d'une unité de cadre | [2015/32] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2015 | Examination requested [2015/52] | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 25.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04798402.6 / EP1684976 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 24.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 24.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.06.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 19.02.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2015 | 19.02.2015 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2015 | 19.02.2015 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2015 | 19.02.2015 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2015 | 19.02.2015 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2015 | 19.02.2015 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2015 | 19.02.2015 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2015 | 19.02.2015 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2015 | 19.02.2015 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.11.2004 | AT | 03.01.2018 | CY | 03.01.2018 | CZ | 03.01.2018 | DK | 03.01.2018 | EE | 03.01.2018 | ES | 03.01.2018 | FI | 03.01.2018 | IT | 03.01.2018 | MC | 03.01.2018 | NL | 03.01.2018 | PL | 03.01.2018 | PT | 03.01.2018 | RO | 03.01.2018 | SE | 03.01.2018 | SI | 03.01.2018 | SK | 03.01.2018 | TR | 03.01.2018 | BG | 03.04.2018 | GR | 04.04.2018 | IS | 03.05.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/28] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PT | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
TR | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
MC | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SI | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
DK | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
SK | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
EE | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
RO | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
IT | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
BG | 03.04.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 03.01.2018 | |
CY | 03.01.2018 | ||
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
SE | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IS | 03.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
GR | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 03.01.2018 | |
ES | 03.01.2018 | ||
FI | 03.01.2018 | ||
NL | 03.01.2018 | ||
PL | 03.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 03.01.2018 | |
NL | 03.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2303333 (WILLIAMS DAVID GODFREY [GB]); | [XI]GB2317366 (WILLIAMS DAVID GODFREY [GB], et al); | [A]JP2000015777 (PROCESS LAB MICRON KK) | by applicant | US5606911 | US5606912 | US5941171 | US6038969 | US6067903 | US6289804 | GB2388073 |