Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9761244 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2017 | B2 | US2015248895 | 03.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014040649 | 03.03.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6337519B | Global Dossier | 06.06.2018 | B2 | JP2015166764 | 24.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014040649 | 03.03.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2916322 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014040649 | 03.03.2014 |