EP2913869 - Apparatus and process for producing electricity storage material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2018/18] |
Former [2015/36] | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mio, Takumi c/o JTEKT CORPORATION; 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
Nishi, Koji c/o JTEKT CORPORATION; 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 03 /
Kubota, Sachiko c/o JTEKT CORPORATION; 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 04 /
Ando, Jun c/o NEOS COMPANY LIMITED; 2-1, Kano-cho 6-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 650-0001 / JP | 05 /
Ichihara, Yutaka c/o NEOS COMPANY LIMITED CENTRAL RESEARCH LABORATORY 1-1, Oike-cho Konan-shi, Shiga 520-3213 / JP | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2015/36] | Application number, filing date | 15156483.8 | 25.02.2015 | [2015/36] | Priority number, date | JP20140035750 | 26.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014035750 | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2913869 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2913869 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29B7/60, H01M4/04, H01M4/139, H01M4/36, H01M4/62 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
H01M4/04 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/043 (US);
B29B7/60 (US);
H01M4/139 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/36 (US);
H01M4/62 (US);
|
Former IPC [2015/36] | H01M4/04, H01M4/139, H01M4/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] |
Former [2015/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Elektrizitätsspeichermaterial | [2015/36] | English: | Apparatus and process for producing electricity storage material | [2015/36] | French: | Appareil et procédé de production de matériau de stockage d'électricité | [2015/36] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.03.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 23.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2015 | AL | 02.05.2018 | AT | 02.05.2018 | CY | 02.05.2018 | CZ | 02.05.2018 | DK | 02.05.2018 | EE | 02.05.2018 | ES | 02.05.2018 | FI | 02.05.2018 | HR | 02.05.2018 | IT | 02.05.2018 | LT | 02.05.2018 | LV | 02.05.2018 | MC | 02.05.2018 | MK | 02.05.2018 | NL | 02.05.2018 | PL | 02.05.2018 | RO | 02.05.2018 | RS | 02.05.2018 | SE | 02.05.2018 | SI | 02.05.2018 | SK | 02.05.2018 | SM | 02.05.2018 | TR | 02.05.2018 | BG | 02.08.2018 | NO | 02.08.2018 | GR | 03.08.2018 | IS | 02.09.2018 | PT | 03.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 25.02.2015 | |
AL | 02.05.2018 | ||
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IS | 02.09.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
PT | 03.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
TR | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.05.2018 | |
AT | 02.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
IT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 02.05.2018 | |
CZ | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SK | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
ES | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
RS | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH08190912 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0005] , [0011] , [0045] , [0055] - [0058] * [A] 7-9; | [XAI]US2011052984 (NAKAMURA TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 4,5 * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0150] * * paragraph [0153] - paragraph [0155] * [A] 3,6-9 [I] 1,2; | [XI]US2012187347 (EILERTSEN THOR E [US], et al) [X] 4-9 * claims 5,6; table 5 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0029] - [0031] - [0045] - [0047] * * paragraphs [0066] - [0067] - [0079] - [0088] * [I] 1-3; | [XAI]WO2013166598 (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA], et al) [X] 4,5 * paragraphs [0031] , [0059] - [0067] * * paragraphs [0070] - [0077] - [0085] - [0086] * [A] 3,6-9[I] 1,2 | Examination | EP1881546 | WO2013129254 | by applicant | JPH1092436 | JP2001250558 |