Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10368727 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2019 | B2 | US2017367565 | 28.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014037385 | 27.02.2014 | US201715677853 | 15.08.2017 | US201514625394 | 18.02.2015 | JP2014113260 | 30.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5958727B | Global Dossier | 02.08.2016 | B2 | JP2015177984 | 08.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014037385 | 27.02.2014 | JP2015093234 | 30.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3459427 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2020 | B1 | EP3459427 | 27.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014037385 | 27.02.2014 | EP15156598 | 25.02.2015 | JP2014113260 | 30.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108577788B | Global Dossier | 11.08.2020 | B | CN108577788 | 28.09.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014037385 | 27.02.2014 | CN201510089971 | 27.02.2015 | JP2014113260 | 30.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9826890 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2017 | B2 | US2015238069 | 27.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014037385 | 27.02.2014 | JP2014113260 | 30.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5853179B | Global Dossier | 09.02.2016 | B2 | JP2015177947 | 08.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014037385 | 27.02.2014 | JP2014113260 | 30.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104873160B | Global Dossier | 23.03.2018 | B | CN104873160 | 02.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2014037385 | 27.02.2014 | JP2014113260 | 30.05.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2912994 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2018 | B1 | EP2912994 | 02.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2014037385 | 27.02.2014 | JP2014113260 | 30.05.2014 | Type | Divisional application | EP3459427 |