EP2912994 - ENDOSCOPE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF ENDOSCOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2018/41] |
Former [2015/36] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osada, Akinori c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property ManagementCo. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
Sanada, Takafumi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property ManagementCo. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
Hanada, Yasuyuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property ManagementCo. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
Haraguchi, Naoyuki c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property ManagementCo. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 05 /
Suzuki, Takahisa c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property ManagementCo. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 06 /
Tanaka, Tooru c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property ManagementCo. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | 07 /
Nagayasu, Hiroshi c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property ManagementCo. Ltd. IP Management Department 7F OBP Panasonic Tower, 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi Osaka, 540-6207 / JP | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2015/36] | Application number, filing date | 15156598.3 | 25.02.2015 | [2015/36] | Priority number, date | JP20140037385 | 27.02.2014 Original published format: JP 2014037385 | JP20140113260 | 30.05.2014 Original published format: JP 2014113260 | [2015/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2912994 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2912994 | Date: | 10.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G02B23/24, A61B1/00, A61B1/05, G02B7/02 | [2018/13] | CPC: |
A61B1/05 (EP,CN,US);
G02B23/2476 (EP,CN,US);
A61B1/00096 (EP,CN,US);
A61B1/0011 (EP,CN,US);
G02B23/2423 (EP,US);
G02B7/025 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/36] | A61B1/00, A61B1/05, G02B7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2015/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ENDOSKOP UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES ENDOSKOPS | [2015/36] | English: | ENDOSCOPE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD OF ENDOSCOPE | [2015/36] | French: | ENDOSCOPE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ENDOSCOPE | [2015/36] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 10.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18199048.2 / EP3459427 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2015 | AL | 10.10.2018 | AT | 10.10.2018 | CY | 10.10.2018 | CZ | 10.10.2018 | DK | 10.10.2018 | EE | 10.10.2018 | ES | 10.10.2018 | FI | 10.10.2018 | HR | 10.10.2018 | IT | 10.10.2018 | LT | 10.10.2018 | LV | 10.10.2018 | MC | 10.10.2018 | MK | 10.10.2018 | NL | 10.10.2018 | PL | 10.10.2018 | RO | 10.10.2018 | RS | 10.10.2018 | SE | 10.10.2018 | SI | 10.10.2018 | SK | 10.10.2018 | SM | 10.10.2018 | TR | 10.10.2018 | BG | 10.01.2019 | NO | 10.01.2019 | GR | 11.01.2019 | IS | 10.02.2019 | PT | 10.02.2019 | GB | 25.02.2019 | IE | 25.02.2019 | LU | 25.02.2019 | MT | 25.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | CH | 28.02.2019 | FR | 28.02.2019 | LI | 28.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 25.02.2015 | |
AL | 10.10.2018 | ||
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CY | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
GB | 25.02.2019 | ||
IE | 25.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
MT | 25.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CY | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
GB | 25.02.2019 | ||
IE | 25.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
MT | 25.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
GB | 25.02.2019 | ||
IE | 25.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
MT | 25.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
TR | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
GB | 25.02.2019 | ||
IE | 25.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
GB | 25.02.2019 | ||
IE | 25.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
BE | 28.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
FR | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
IE | 25.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
CH | 28.02.2019 | ||
LI | 28.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SI | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
LU | 25.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
MC | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SK | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
EE | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RO | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
SM | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
DK | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
IT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 10.10.2018 | |
AT | 10.10.2018 | ||
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
PT | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
RS | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
SE | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
GR | 11.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 10.10.2018 | |
ES | 10.10.2018 | ||
FI | 10.10.2018 | ||
HR | 10.10.2018 | ||
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
LV | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
PL | 10.10.2018 | ||
BG | 10.01.2019 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 10.10.2018 | |
LT | 10.10.2018 | ||
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
IS | 10.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 10.10.2018 | |
NL | 10.10.2018 | ||
NO | 10.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 10.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]EP2680059 (FUJIKURA LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] , [0017] , [0023] * * claim 6 * * figures 3B,5B,6 * [A] 12 [Y] 8-10 [I] 4-7,11; | [A]EP2148232 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * figures 4A,4B * | [Y] - Thierry Materne ET AL, "Organosilane Technology in Coating Applications: Review and Perspectives", (20120101), pages 1 - 16, URL: http://www.dowcorning.com/content/publishedlit/26-1402-01.pdf, (20150319), XP055177976 [Y] 8-10 * page 3 * * figure 18 * | Examination | WO2013031276 | by applicant | JPH0312124 |