EP3062029 - RADIATOR BRACKET AND SYSTEM FOR FIXING A RADIATOR ON A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sigarth AB Box 45 330 33 Hillerstorp / SE | [2016/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thorn, Håkan Studievägen 9 570 15 Holsbybrunn / SE | [2016/35] | Representative(s) | Bergenstråhle & Partners AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/35] | Bergenstråhle Group AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 15156815.1 | 26.02.2015 | [2016/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3062029 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3062029 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/02 | [2016/35] | CPC: |
F24D19/0209 (EP);
F24D19/0216 (EP);
F24D19/023 (EP);
F24D19/0276 (EP);
F24D19/0283 (EP);
F24D19/0293 (EP);
F24D2220/2054 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] |
Former [2016/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HEIZKÖRPERHALTERUNG UND SYSTEM ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINES HEIZKÖRPERS AUF EINEM UNTERGRUND | [2016/35] | English: | RADIATOR BRACKET AND SYSTEM FOR FIXING A RADIATOR ON A SUBSTRATE | [2016/35] | French: | SUPPORT DE RADIATEUR ET SYSTÈME DE FIXATION D'UN RADIATEUR SUR UN SUBSTRAT | [2016/35] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 13.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2015 | AL | 14.08.2019 | CY | 14.08.2019 | DK | 14.08.2019 | ES | 14.08.2019 | FI | 14.08.2019 | HR | 14.08.2019 | MC | 14.08.2019 | MK | 14.08.2019 | MT | 14.08.2019 | RO | 14.08.2019 | RS | 14.08.2019 | SM | 14.08.2019 | BG | 14.11.2019 | NO | 14.11.2019 | GR | 15.11.2019 | IS | 14.12.2019 | PT | 16.12.2019 | LU | 26.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 26.02.2015 | |
AL | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
MT | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
ES | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | NO | 14.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4415339 (HEUEL WILHELM [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,7 * columns 1-3; figures 1, 5, 6 *; | [XI]DE29708809U (BUDERUS HEIZTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-8 * pages 2, 3; figures 1-3 * [I] 3,9; | [X]EP1209422 (MB SRL [IT]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * paragraphs [0028] - [0051]; figures 1-5 *; | [X]WO2010103385 (IRCA SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-9 * pages 4-10; figures 1-8 *; | [X]DE202011003864U (ULAMO HOLDING BV [NL]) [X] 1,2,7,8 * paragraphs [0023] - [0036]; figures 1-9 *; | [X]DE102010019938 (WEMEFA HORST CHRISTOPEIT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,7 * paragraphs [0015] - [0020]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE202012006316U (ULAMO HOLDING BV [NL]) [A] 1-9* the whole document * | by applicant | EP2498011 |