EP2913595 - HEATER VALVE DEVICE WITH OBLONG HOLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred Balg GmbH Engeldorfer Straße 28 50321 Brühl / DE | [2015/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Balg, Hans-Alfred Unter dem Dorf 6 50321 Brühl / DE | [2015/36] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2017/17] |
Former [2015/36] | Von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 15156960.5 | 27.02.2015 | [2015/36] | Priority number, date | DE201410203548 | 27.02.2014 Original published format: DE102014203548 | [2015/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2913595 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2913595 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24D19/00, F24D19/10, F16K3/24, F16K3/32, F16K5/10 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
F16K3/24 (EP);
F24D19/1018 (EP,US);
F16K11/202 (EP);
F16K3/32 (EP);
F16K5/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2015/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HEIZKÖRPERVENTILVORRICHTUNG MIT LANGLOCH | [2015/36] | English: | HEATER VALVE DEVICE WITH OBLONG HOLE | [2015/36] | French: | ROBINET DE RADIATEUR PRÉSENTANT UN TROU OBLONG | [2015/36] | Examination procedure | 11.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 18.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17167939.2 / EP3222920 | EP17167957.4 / EP3222921 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2015 | AL | 26.04.2017 | CY | 26.04.2017 | CZ | 26.04.2017 | DK | 26.04.2017 | EE | 26.04.2017 | ES | 26.04.2017 | FI | 26.04.2017 | HR | 26.04.2017 | IT | 26.04.2017 | LT | 26.04.2017 | LV | 26.04.2017 | MC | 26.04.2017 | MK | 26.04.2017 | MT | 26.04.2017 | PL | 26.04.2017 | PT | 26.04.2017 | RO | 26.04.2017 | RS | 26.04.2017 | SE | 26.04.2017 | SI | 26.04.2017 | SK | 26.04.2017 | SM | 26.04.2017 | TR | 26.04.2017 | BG | 26.07.2017 | NO | 26.07.2017 | GR | 27.07.2017 | IS | 26.08.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.02.2015 | |
CY | 26.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MK | 26.04.2017 | ||
MT | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 27.02.2015 | |
CZ | 26.04.2017 | ||
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MT | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MT | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
PT | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MT | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
TR | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MC | 26.04.2017 | ||
MT | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
MT | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SI | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
IT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
SM | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 26.04.2017 | |
DK | 26.04.2017 | ||
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RO | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
SK | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 26.04.2017 | |
EE | 26.04.2017 | ||
ES | 26.04.2017 | ||
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
LV | 26.04.2017 | ||
PL | 26.04.2017 | ||
RS | 26.04.2017 | ||
SE | 26.04.2017 | ||
BG | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 26.04.2017 | |
FI | 26.04.2017 | ||
HR | 26.04.2017 | ||
LT | 26.04.2017 | ||
NO | 26.07.2017 | ||
GR | 27.07.2017 | ||
IS | 26.08.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB948738 (FILIP EMANUEL ODELL, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US2008245428 (JORGENSEN OLE [DK]) [X] 1-5,8,9,12,17 * the whole document * [Y] 10,11,14-16 [I] 6,13; | [XI]US2009199905 (TRANTHAM JOHN M [US]) [X] 1,2,5,9,13 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,6-8; | [XI]US2009321672 (IBSEN BJARNE WITTENDORF [DK], et al) [X] 1-5,9,12 * the whole document * [I] 6-8; | [Y]DE102011084297 (BALG HANS-ALFRED [DE]) [Y] 10,11,14-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2696145 (KERMI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,10,11* the whole document * |