EP3064663 - Sanitary device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geberit International AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | [2016/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiss, Rolf Brunnenstrasse 4 8632 Tann / CH | 02 /
Zwicker, Maurus Wiesengrünstrasse 4 8733 Eschenbach / CH | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2020/29] |
Former [2016/36] | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 15157388.8 | 03.03.2015 | [2016/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3064663 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3064663 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E03D1/38 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
E03D1/38 (EP);
E03D11/02 (CN);
E03D11/13 (CN);
E03D11/143 (EP);
E03D11/17 (CN);
E03D9/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2016/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Sanitäreinrichtung | [2016/36] | English: | Sanitary device | [2016/36] | French: | Dispositif sanitaire | [2016/36] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 14.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.03.2020 | 07.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2015 | AL | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | FI | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | MT | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | RS | 15.07.2020 | SE | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | SM | 15.07.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 03.03.2015 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MK | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 03.03.2015 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 03.03.2015 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 15.07.2020 | |
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
FI | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
RS | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
SE | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 15.07.2020 | |
LT | 15.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3128525 (IFOE SANITAER AB [SE]) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [A]EP1911898 (INAX CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XAYI]US2010207043 (GALVEZ-RAMOS ANTONIO MARTIN [US]) [X] 1-4,13,16,17 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0055] * [A] 12 [Y] 15 [I] 5-11,14,15; | [YA]US2013291297 (KITAMURA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1 | by applicant | DE3128525 |