EP2916621 - Hybrid dimming control techniques for lighting drivers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM SYLVANIA INC. 100 Endicott Street Danvers, MA 01923 / US | [2015/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siessegger, Bernhard 9 Hardy Street Danvers, MA Massachusetts 01923 / US | 02 /
Alexandrovich, Benjamin 14 Gibbs Street 1 Brookline, MA Massachusetts 02446 / US | [2015/37] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/37] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 15157527.1 | 04.03.2015 | [2015/37] | Priority number, date | US201414196619 | 04.03.2014 Original published format: US201414196619 | [2015/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2916621 | Date: | 09.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2916621 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2015/37] | CPC: |
H05B45/40 (EP,US);
H05B45/10 (EP,US);
H05B45/382 (EP,US);
H05B45/39 (EP,US);
H05B45/42 (EP,US);
H05B45/44 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2015/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hybride Dimmersteuerungstechniken zur Beleuchtung von Treibern | [2015/37] | English: | Hybrid dimming control techniques for lighting drivers | [2015/37] | French: | Techniques de commande de gradation hybride pour des pilotes d'éclairage | [2015/37] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2015 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 25.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2013293126 (CHEN WU [CN], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-11,13-16 * paragraphs [0026] - [0046]; figures 3-6 * [I] 2,3,12; | [X]US2010052568 (COHEN ISAAC [US]) [X] 1-4,7-9,12,13 * paragraphs [0022] - [0042]; figures 2-8 *; | [X]EP2296439 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,3,4,7-9,12,13 * paragraphs [0024] - [0072]; figures 1-6 *; | [XI]US2012217884 (RAYKHMAN MYKHAYLO [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-9,12,13 * paragraphs [0034] - [0042]; figure 2 * [I] 2 |